FORWARD v. RTI BIOLOGICS INC

Defendant: RTI BIOLOGICS INC
Plaintiff: FONDA FORWARD
Case Number: 1:2012cv00007
Filed: January 12, 2012
Court: Florida Northern District Court
Office: Gainesville Office
County: Alachua
Referring Judge: GARY R JONES
Presiding Judge: STEPHAN P MICKLE
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 5, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: Plaintiff's 16 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 6/5/2012. (jws)
July 17, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff's 22 MOTION to Compel (TITLED: Motion to Deem Admitted Requests for Admissions) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiffs request for an award of attorneys fees and costs as a sanction for bringing the motion to compel is DENIED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 7/17/2012. (jws)
September 5, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 37 LEAVE TO FILE REPLY AND SUR-REPLY - Defendant shall file a reply not to exceed 10 pages. Plaintiff shall file a sur-reply not to exceed 10 pages. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if reply not filed earlier: 9/12/2012)., Sur-Reply due by 9/19/2012.). Signed by SENIOR JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 9/5/2012. (jws)
September 11, 2012 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Case is DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to 42 Mediation Disposition Report. All pending motions are DENIED as moot. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 9/11/2012. (jws)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FORWARD v. RTI BIOLOGICS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RTI BIOLOGICS INC
Represented By: RICHARD COURTNEY MCCREA
Represented By: MATTHEW LOGAN RANSDELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FONDA FORWARD
Represented By: MICHAEL OWEN MASSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.