LANGILLE v. HOFER

Plaintiff: DEANNA LANGILLE
Defendant: JAY HOFER, MIRIAM DILLARD, COMMISSIONER and EDWARD SUARZ
Case Number: 1:2012cv00127
Filed: June 13, 2012
Court: Florida Northern District Court
Office: Gainesville Office
County: Alachua
Referring Judge: GARY R JONES
Presiding Judge: MAURICE M PAUL
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7426
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 9 Motion for TRO. Plaintiff's request to seal affidavit in support of TRO is GRANTED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 9/27/2012. (jws)
February 13, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Government's 6 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED and this case is DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and failure to state a claim. Plaintiff's 11 , 16 Motions to Amend are DENIED. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 2/13/2013. (jws)
February 21, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 21 Motion for Reconsideration, denying 22 MOTION to Amend Response to Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint by DEANNA LANGILLE. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 2/21/2013. (jws)
March 4, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 24 Motion to Amend and 25 Motion for Declaratory Judgment. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 3/4/2013. (jws)
June 22, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: Clerk shall forward Plaintiff a copy of Fed.Civ.P.4 and two blank summons forms. If summons returned, Clerk directed to issue all summonses w/21 days for Defendant SUARZ and 60 days for remaining Defe ndants. Plaintiff shall provide the Court with certification of service. (Summons returned for Issuance by 7/12/2012. Certification of Service Deadline by 10/11/2012. Notify Chambers on 10/12/2012.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 6/22/2012. (jws)(Summons & Rule 4 to Pla.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LANGILLE v. HOFER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEANNA LANGILLE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAY HOFER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIRIAM DILLARD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD SUARZ
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]