EXPRESS PHONE SERVICE INC v. FLORIDA PUBLIC SERVICE COMMISSION et al

Defendant: JULIE I BROWN, FLORIDA PUBLIC SERVICE COMMISSION, RONALD A BRISE, LISA POLAK EDGAR, ART GRAHAM, EDUARDO E BALBIS and BELLSOUTH TELECOMMUNICATIONS LLC
Plaintiff: EXPRESS PHONE SERVICE INC
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00197
Filed: August 28, 2012
 
Court: Florida Northern District Court
Office: Gainesville Office
County: Leon
Referring Judge: GARY R JONES
Presiding Judge: MAURICE M PAUL
 
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 20, 2012 13 Featured Case ORDER: 12 Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting is ADOPTED: Amended Pleadings and Seek Consolidation of Related Cases due by 12/11/2012 ., Filing of Administrative Record due by 1/25/2013., Plaintiff's Initial Brief due by 2/4/2013., Defendants' Answer Briefs due by 3/6/2013., Plaintiff's Reply Brief due by 3/20/2013. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 11/20/2012. (jws)
January 15, 2013 17 Featured Case ORDER: Parties 16 Joint MOTION to Seal Portions of the Administrative Record is GRANTED. Clerk directed to seal confidential hearing exhbits 21, 26, 36, and 44. (Seal Deadline - by 10/23/2013.). Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 1/15/2013. (jws)
December 12, 2013 28 Featured Case ORDER: Final Order of the Florida Public Service Commission is AFFIRMED. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 12/12/2013. (jws)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: EXPRESS PHONE SERVICE INC v. FLORIDA PUBLIC SERVICE COMMISSION et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JULIE I BROWN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLORIDA PUBLIC SERVICE COMMISSION
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD A BRISE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LISA POLAK EDGAR
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ART GRAHAM
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDUARDO E BALBIS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BELLSOUTH TELECOMMUNICATIONS LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EXPRESS PHONE SERVICE INC
Represented By: MARSHA ELLEN RULE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]