DELLINGER v. INTERNATIONAL RARITIES CORPORATION

Plaintiff: DEAN DELLINGER
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL RARITIES CORPORATION
 
Case Number: 3:2010cv00323
Filed: August 30, 2010
 
Court: Florida Northern District Court
Office: Pensacola Office
County: Escambia
Presiding Judge: RICHARD SMOAK
Referring Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
 
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 21, 2011 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The jury trial scheduled for 7/25/2011 is rescheduled for Jury Trial for Monday, 8/22/2011 08:30 AM in U.S. Courthouse Pensacola before JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 7/21/2011. (sea)
January 7, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dft's motion 14 is denied as to count two of the complaint. Dfts motion 14 is granted as to count three of the complaint, & count three is dismissed. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 1/7/2011. (sea)
January 12, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denied 29 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 1/12/2011. (sea)
July 6, 2011 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 79 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; denying 71 Motion for Sanctions as to Plaintiff's request to strike Defendant's defenses and enter a default judgment. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 7/6/2011. (jcw)
July 12, 2011 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 89 unopposed motion for leave from the deadline for filing pretrial motions. Pla's motion is granted as to his three motions in limine. Dft shall respond to Pla's motions in limine not later than noon on July 15, 2011. Pla's motion is denied as to his motion for summary judgment, which was not attached to Pla's motion. ( Response to motion due by by 7/15/2011.)Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 7/12/2011. (sea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: DELLINGER v. INTERNATIONAL RARITIES CORPORATION
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEAN DELLINGER
Represented By: JOSEPH A ZARZAUR, JR
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL RARITIES CORPORATION
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]