JACKSON v. CREWS et al

Defendant: WHITE, RUMMEL, M NICHOLS, MICHAEL CREWS, R COMERFORD, JOHNSON and SISTRUNK
Plaintiff: RICHARD JACKSON
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00174
Filed: April 17, 2013
 
Court: Florida Northern District Court
Office: Pensacola Office
County: Santa Rosa
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Referring Judge: CHARLES J KAHN
 
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 13, 2014 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the magistrate judge's 90 Report and Recommendation. The Plaintiff's 84 Motion for Temporary Injunction is DENIED. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/13/2014. (djb)
June 6, 2014 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting the Magistrate's 107 Report and Recommendation. Defendants' motion to dismiss Plaintiff's first amended complaint (doc. 29 , adopted by docs. 40 , 65 , 69 ), is DENIED AS MOOT in light of Plain tiffs filing a 105 second amended complaint. Plaintiff's motion to voluntarily dismiss the claims against Defendant Michael Crews asserted in Plaintiff's first amended complaint (doc. 58 ) is DENIED AS MOOT in light of Plaintiff's filing a second amended complaint. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 06/06/2014. (MB)
July 2, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 11 Report and Recommendation.The pla's motions for a temporary preliminary injunction (docs. 2 , 5 ) are DENIED. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on July 2, 2013. (kvg)
October 7, 2014 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the Magistrate Judge's 129 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Defendants' motion to dismiss (doc. 115 ) is GRANTED. This case is DISMISSED under 28 U.S.C. § 1915A for plaintiff's failure to state a cla im upon which relief may be granted (failure to properly exhaust available administrative remedies). The Clerk is directed to close the file. Plaintiff's request that he not be required to pay a second filing fee should he re-file this action (doc. 120 , p. 10) is DENIED. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/07/2014. (MB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: JACKSON v. CREWS et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHITE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUMMEL
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M NICHOLS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL CREWS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R COMERFORD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SISTRUNK
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD JACKSON
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]