CAIN v. SHELL OIL COMPANY

Defendant: SHELL OIL COMPANY and CIRCLE K STORES INC
Plaintiff: RALPH REGINALD CAIN
Case Number: 4:2013cv00077
Filed: February 22, 2013
Court: Florida Northern District Court
Office: Tallahassee Office
County: Leon
Presiding Judge: MARK E WALKER
Referring Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 20, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 45 MOTION TO STRIKE. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/20/2013. (dlt)
January 8, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 52 CIRCLE K STORES, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/8/2014. (dlt)
January 10, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 50 SHELL OIL CO.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. This Court does not direct the entry of judgment under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b). Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/10/2014. (dlt)
January 16, 2014 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 73 MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARING AT PRETRIAL. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/16/2014. (dlt)
January 21, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS, ECF NOS. 64 and 66 - This Court has considered Plaintiffs' Motion for Order Authorizing Release of Social Security Numbers and Dates of Birth of Former Employees of Circle K Stores, Inc., ECF No. 64 , and Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine Regarding Trial Matters, ECF No. 66 , and heard argument from counsel at a hearing held on January 17, 2014. For the reasons and subject to the conditions stated on the record, the motions are GRANTED. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/21/2014. (dlt)
January 29, 2014 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON DEFENDANT SHELL OIL CO.'S MOTION TO TAX FEES AND COSTS - Shell's motion to tax fees and costs is DENIED without prejudice to be refiled at the appropriate time. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/29/2014. (dlt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CAIN v. SHELL OIL COMPANY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHELL OIL COMPANY
Represented By: ROBERT M STOLER
Represented By: CATHERINE MARIE VERONA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIRCLE K STORES INC
Represented By: ROBERT M STOLER
Represented By: CATHERINE MARIE VERONA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RALPH REGINALD CAIN
Represented By: HENRY C HUNTER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]