CITY OF PANAMA CITY BEACH v. AG EDWARDS TRUST COMPANY FSB et al

Plaintiff: CITY OF PANAMA CITY BEACH
Defendant: AG EDWARDS TRUST COMPANY FSB, A DENNIS PLEDGER, GERALD T PLEDGER, ALVIN'S STORES INC, LAMAR CORPORATION, AMSOUTH BANK OF FLORIDA, J H SHERMAN, JR, SIGNAL HILL GOLF COURSE INC, PEGGY BRANNON, ZANE SPITZER and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 5:2010cv00150
Filed: June 10, 2010
Court: Florida Northern District Court
Office: Panama City Office
County: Bay
Presiding Judge: RICHARD SMOAK
Nature of Suit: IRS-Third Party
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Status Report due by 7/16/2010. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 7/9/2010. (sea)
August 12, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The parties shall file any response re 20 Letter (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 8/27/2010). Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 8/12/2010. (sea)
September 2, 2010 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. 27 Pla's Request for Recusal. JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK recused. Case reassigned to JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE for all further proceedings. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 9/2/2010. (sea)
June 24, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the United States shall file its response to the Petition in Eminent Domain not later than 6/30/10; UNITED STATES OF AMERICA answer due 6/30/2010. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 6/24/2010. (sea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CITY OF PANAMA CITY BEACH v. AG EDWARDS TRUST COMPANY FSB et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CITY OF PANAMA CITY BEACH
Represented By: CELESTE F ADORNO
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AG EDWARDS TRUST COMPANY FSB
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A DENNIS PLEDGER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GERALD T PLEDGER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALVIN'S STORES INC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAMAR CORPORATION
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMSOUTH BANK OF FLORIDA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J H SHERMAN, JR
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIGNAL HILL GOLF COURSE INC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEGGY BRANNON
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZANE SPITZER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: BENJAMIN W BEARD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]