UNITED FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY v. WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION

Plaintiff: UNITED FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY
Defendant: WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION
Case Number: 5:2010cv00199
Filed: July 22, 2010
Court: Florida Northern District Court
Office: Panama City Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: RICHARD SMOAK
Referring Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 12, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Discovery due by 7/15/2011. Mediation to take place by 7/13/2011. Mediation Report due by 7/20/2011. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 7/29/2011. Pretrial Stipulation due by 9/15/2011. P retrial Conference set for 9/22/2011 03:30 PM in U.S. Courthouse Panama City before JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK. Absent extraordinary circumstances, no further extension will be granted. Bench Trial set for 10/3/2011 08:30 AM in U.S. Courthouse Panama City before JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 5/12/2011. (sea)
September 20, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Motion to Strike. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 9/20/2011. (jcw)
September 22, 2011 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion for Summary Judgment for Defendant against Plaintiff. The clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 9/22/2011. (jcw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY v. WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY
Represented By: MATTHEW WESTON PEAIRE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION
Represented By: BILL B MCEACHERN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]