Remington v. Newbridge Securities Corp.

Plaintiff: Richard Remington
Defendant: Newbridge Securities Corp.
 
Case Number: 0:2013cv60384
Filed: February 19, 2013
 
Court: Florida Southern District Court
Office: Ft Lauderdale Office
County: Broward
Presiding Judge: James I. Cohn
Referring Judge: Barry S. Seltzer
 
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 7, 2014 119 Featured Case ORDER denying 88 Newbridge's Motion In Limine to Exclude Testimony from Plaintiffs' Expert, Gene E. Carasick, Esq., denying 91 Newbridge's Motion for Summary Judgment, and granting 93 Plaintiffs' Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Plaintiff Remington's Claim, and for Leave for Plaintiff Finkel to File Her Fourth Amended Complaint and Renewed Motion for Class Certification. Please see Order for details. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 2/7/2014. (ns)
July 18, 2014 143 Featured Case ORDER granting 135 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents. Please see Order for details. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 7/18/2014. (kas)
June 5, 2013 51 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 40 Motion to Stay; granting 28 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiffs may file a Second Amended Complaint by no later than June 21, 2013. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 6/5/2013. (ams)
August 20, 2013 62 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 55 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. See Order for details. Signed by Judge James I. Cohn on 8/20/2013. (ams)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Remington v. Newbridge Securities Corp.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Remington
Represented By: Darren Craig Blum
Represented By: Randall C. Place
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newbridge Securities Corp.
Represented By: Dennis A. Nowak
Represented By: Gregg Jeffrey Breitbart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]