Intellectual Ventures I LLC et al v. Motorola Mobility LLC

Plaintiff: Intellectual Ventures II LLC and Intellectual Ventures I LLC
Defendant: Motorola Mobility LLC
Case Number: 0:2013cv61358
Filed: June 19, 2013
Court: Florida Southern District Court
Office: Ft Lauderdale Office
County: Broward
Referring Judge: Patrick M. Hunt
Presiding Judge: Robin S. Rosenbaum
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:0271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 27, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Motion of M. Elizabeth Day to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 6/27/2013. (bon)
June 27, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Motion of Marc Belloli to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 6/27/2013. (bon)
July 25, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Motion of Mitchell G. Stockwell, Esq., to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Please see Order for details. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 7/25/2013. (bon)
August 19, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 Motion of Taylor Ludlam, Esq., to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 8/19/2013. (bon)
January 14, 2014 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 26 Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue to the District of Delaware. Please see Order for details. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 1/14/2014. (ssk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intellectual Ventures I LLC et al v. Motorola Mobility LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intellectual Ventures II LLC
Represented By: Marc C. Belloli(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Howard Mitchell Bushman(Designation Retained)
Represented By: M. Elizabeth Day(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Sarah Clasby Engel(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Lance August Harke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intellectual Ventures I LLC
Represented By: Lance August Harke
Represented By: Sarah Clasby Engel(Designation Retained)
Represented By: M. Elizabeth Day(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Howard Mitchell Bushman(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Marc C. Belloli(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola Mobility LLC
Represented By: Regan Noelle Kruse
Represented By: Edward Maurice Mullins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]