adidas AG et al v. Wu et al Featured Case

Defendant: world-jerseys.com, world-soccer-shoes.com, zigtechreebokshoes.org, Does 1-10, well-sports.com, uubest.com, usa-soccer-jersey.com, various-jersey-wholesale.com, wholesalejerseysfromchina.com, wholesale-from-china.com, socceroutlets.com, soccershoes4you.com, womenadidas.com, wholesalesoccercleats.com, tradeccc.net, trikotdiscount.com, toahk.com, topjerseysorder.com, supercheapsoccer.com, superstarkick.com, soccershoesstores.com, soccerusa4you.com, soccer-cleats-shoes.com, soccerjerseycenter.com, shopsoccerjerseys.com, soccercleats4u.com, soccercleatsnike.com, soccercleatsshoes.com, cheapkicksforsale.com, cheapnbashoes.com, adidasshoes001.com, adidasshoessite.com, adidassmith.com, adidassuperstarshoes.com, adidastitanbounce.com, adidastour360.com, adidaswings.com, adidasxjeremyscott.com, airmaxshopchina.com, autobotshop.com, buyjerseysonline.com, buyjerseyswholesale.com, buyteamsportsuniforms.com, caminio.com, ccmjersey.com, chaussures-nike-tn.com, cheap001.com, cheap999.com, cheapjerseysfromchina.com, shopadicolor.com, reebokonlineoutlet.com, reebok-member.com, reebokeasytoneonline.com, reebok123.com, ptjerseys.org, ptjerseys.net, ptjerseys.com, plentystock.com, outlet-jerseys.com, onlinesoccerboots.co.uk, nikeshoes001.com, nike-mercurial-store.com, nikemercurialshoes.com, nba-home.com, nba-basketball-shoes.net, mercurialshoesoutlet.com, lowestbestexport.com, lovinadidas.com, jerseys-googler.com, jerseysfull.com, jerseysfromchina.info, jerseysfromchina.com, jerseysforcheap.biz, jeremyscottwing.com, jeremyscottsadidas.com, inthestyleshop.com, indoor-soccershoes.com, ilove-shopping.org, helloadidas.com, gsdiscount.com, footballjerseys4sale.com, footballbootsuk.com, footballcleatsstore.com, fashion333.com, everysportuniforms.com, cn-jerseys.com, cheapshopping4u.com, adidassbounce.com, adidasscarpecalcio.com, adidasporschedesignde.com, adidas-originals.com, adidas-online-shop.com, adidasjp.com, adidasjswings.com, adidasjeremyscott.com, adidasf50shoes.com, adidasf50adizeroshop.com, adidas-f50-adizero.com, adidasempire.com, adidasbounces.com, adiclothing.com, 888shop-jerseys.com, 4adidas.com, 2010shopjerseys.org, 2010shopjerseys.net, Danyu Wu, soccershoesproducts.com and soccershoesforsales.com
Plaintiff: Reebok International Ltd., Reebok International Limited, adidas America, Inc., adidas AG and adidas International Marketing B.V.
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv24094
Filed: November 14, 2011
 
Court: Florida Southern District Court
Office: Miami Office
County: Dade - EXPIRED
Presiding Judge: Marcia G. Cooke
Referring Judge: William C. Turnoff
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
December 1, 2011 11 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING MOTION to the Honorable William C. Turnoff for Report and Recommendation: 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Order Restraining Transfer of Assets Tied to the Counterfeiting Operation filed by Reebok International Limited, adidas AG, adidas America, Inc., adidas International Marketing B.V., Reebok International Ltd. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/1/2011. (scy)
December 1, 2011 10 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 11/30/2011. (tm)
December 1, 2011 9 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff for Pretrial Proceedings. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 11/30/2011. (tm)
November 22, 2011 8 *Endorsed Order Directing Clerk to Unseal 6 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 11/22/2011. (scy)
November 17, 2011 7 Clerks Notice to Filer re 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Order Restraining Transfer of Assets Tied to the Counterfeiting Operation . Sealed Document Filed Electronically; ERROR - The Filer failed to file a sealed document in the conventional paper format. The document has been restricted and the docket text has been corrected. It is not necessary to refile the document but future sealed filings must be filed in the conventional paper format in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. (nc)
November 15, 2011 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ( Responses due by 12/2/2011), MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , MOTION for Order Restraining Transfer of Assets Tied to the Counterfeiting Operation by Reebok International Limited, Reebok International Ltd., adidas AG, adidas America, Inc., adidas International Marketing B.V.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Order Restraining Transfer of Assets Tied to the Counterfeiting Operation, # 2 Declaration of Stephen M. Gaffigan n Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Order Restraining Transfer of Assets Tied to the Counterfeiting Operation, # 3 Exhibit A part 1 of 9 - to the Declaration of Stephen M. Gaffigan, # 4 Exhibit A part 2 of 9 - to the Declaration of Stephen M. Gaffigan, # 5 Exhibit A part 3 of 9 - to the Declaration of Stephen M. Gaffigan, # 6 Exhibit A part 4 of 9 - to the Declaration of Stephen M. Gaffigan, # 7 Exhibit A part 5 of 9 - to the Declaration of Stephen M. Gaffigan, # 8 Exhibit A part 6 of 9 - to the Declaration of Stephen M. Gaffigan, # 9 Exhibit A part 7 of 9 - to the Declaration of Stephen M. Gaffigan, # 10 Exhibit A part 8 of 9 - to the Declaration of Stephen M. Gaffigan, # 11 Exhibit A part 9 of 9 - to the Declaration of Stephen M. Gaffigan, # 12 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Stephen M. Gaffigan in Support, # 13 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Stephen M. Gaffigan in Support, # 14 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Stephen M. Gaffigan in Support, # 15 Exhibit E to the Declaration of Stephen M. Gaffigan in Support, # 16 Exhibit F part 1 of 2 - to the Declaration of Stephen M. Gaffigan in Support, # 17 Exhibit F part 2 of 2 - to the Declaration of Stephen M. Gaffigan in Support, # 18 Declaration of Jeni B. Zuercher in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Order Restraining Transfer of Assets Tied to the Counterfeiting Operation, # 19 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Jeni B. Zuercher, # 20 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Jeni B. Zuercher, # 21 Declaration of Brandon Tanori in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Order Restraining Transfer of Assets Tied to the Counterfeiting Operation, # 22 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Brandon Tanori, # 23 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Brandon Tanori, # 24 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Brandon Tanori, # 25 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Brandon Tanori, # 26 Exhibit E to the Declaration of Brandon Tanori, # 27 Exhibit F to the Declaration of Brandon Tanori, # 28 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaffigan, Stephen) Modified by sealing document on 11/17/2011 (nc). Modified by unsealing document per 8 Endorsed Order on 11/22/2011 (nc).
November 15, 2011 5 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (yha)
November 15, 2011 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (yha)
November 15, 2011 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Reebok International Limited, Reebok International Ltd., adidas AG, adidas America, Inc., adidas International Marketing B.V. (Gaffigan, Stephen)
November 14, 2011 2 Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke (yha)
November 14, 2011 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants. Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 113C-4230243, filed by adidas International Marketing B.V., adidas AG, adidas America, Inc., Reebok International Limited, Reebok International Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summon(s) to Danyu Wu, # 3 Summon(s) to 2010shopjerseys.net, # 4 Summon(s) to 2010shopjerseys.org, # 5 Summon(s) to 4adidas.com, # 6 Summon(s) to 888shop-jerseys.com, # 7 Summon(s) to adiclothing.com, # 8 Summon(s) to adidasbounces.com, # 9 Summon(s) to adidasempire.com, # 10 Summon(s) to adidas-f50-adizero.com, # 11 Summon(s) to adidasf50adizeroshop.com, # 12 Summon(s) to adidasf50shoes.com, # 13 Summon(s) to adidasjeremyscott.com, # 14 Summon(s) to adidasjp.com, # 15 Summon(s) to adidasjswings.com, # 16 Summon(s) to adidas-online-shop.com, # 17 Summon(s) to adidas-originals.com, # 18 Summon(s) to adidasporschedesignde.com, # 19 Summon(s) to adidassbounce.com, # 20 Summon(s) to adidasscarpecalcio.com, # 21 Summon(s) to adidasshoes001.com, # 22 Summon(s) to adidasshoessite.com, # 23 Summon(s) to adidassmith.com, # 24 Summon(s) to adidassuperstarshoes.com, # 25 Summon(s) to adidastitanbounce.com, # 26 Summon(s) to adidastour360.com, # 27 Summon(s) to adidaswings.com, # 28 Summon(s) to adidasxjeremyscott.com, # 29 Summon(s) to airmaxshopchina.com, # 30 Summon(s) to autobotshop.com, # 31 Summon(s) to buyjerseysonline.com, # 32 Summon(s) to buyjerseyswholesale.com, # 33 Summon(s) to buyteamsportsuniforms.com, # 34 Summon(s) to caminio.com, # 35 Summon(s) to ccmjersey.com, # 36 Summon(s) to chaussures-nike-tn.com, # 37 Summon(s) to cheap001.com, # 38 Summon(s) to cheap999.com, # 39 Summon(s) to cheapjerseysfromchina.com, # 40 Summon(s) to cheapkicksforsale.com, # 41 Summon(s) to cheapnbashoes.com, # 42 Summon(s) to cheapshopping4u.com, # 43 Summon(s) to cn-jerseys.com, # 44 Summon(s) to everysportuniforms.com, # 45 Summon(s) to fashion333.com, # 46 Summon(s) to footballbootsuk.com, # 47 Summon(s) to footballcleatsstore.com, # 48 Summon(s) to footballjerseys4sale.com, # 49 Summon(s) to gsdiscount.com, # 50 Summon(s) to helloadidas.com, # 51 Summon(s) to ilove-shopping.org, # 52 Summon(s) to indoor-soccershoes.com, # 53 Summon(s) to inthestyleshop.com, # 54 Summon(s) to jeremyscottsadidas.com, # 55 Summon(s) to jeremyscottwing.com, # 56 Summon(s) to jerseysforcheap.biz, # 57 Summon(s) to jerseysfromchina.com, # 58 Summon(s) to jerseysfromchina.info, # 59 Summon(s) to jerseysfull.com, # 60 Summon(s) to jerseys-googler.com, # 61 Summon(s) to lovinadidas.com, # 62 Summon(s) to lowestbestexport.com, # 63 Summon(s) to mercurialshoesoutlet.com, # 64 Summon(s) to nba-basketball-shoes.net, # 65 Summon(s) to nba-home.com, # 66 Summon(s) to nikemercurialshoes.com, # 67 Summon(s) to nike-mercurial-store.com, # 68 Summon(s) to nikeshoes001.com, # 69 Summon(s) to onlinesoccerboots.co.uk, # 70 Summon(s) to outlet-jerseys.com, # 71 Summon(s) to plentystock.com, # 72 Summon(s) to ptjerseys.com, # 73 Summon(s) to ptjerseys.net, # 74 Summon(s) to ptjerseys.org, # 75 Summon(s) to reebok123.com, # 76 Summon(s) to reebokeasytoneonline.com, # 77 Summon(s) to reebok-member.com, # 78 Summon(s) to reebokonlineoutlet.com, # 79 Summon(s) to shopadicolor.com, # 80 Summon(s) to shopsoccerjerseys.com, # 81 Summon(s) to soccercleats4u.com, # 82 Summon(s) to soccercleatsnike.com, # 83 Summon(s) to soccercleatsshoes.com, # 84 Summon(s) to soccer-cleats-shoes.com, # 85 Summon(s) to soccerjerseycenter.com, # 86 Summon(s) to socceroutlets.com, # 87 Summon(s) to soccershoes4you.com, # 88 Summon(s) to soccershoesforsales.com, # 89 Summon(s) to soccershoesproducts.com, # 90 Summon(s) to soccershoesstores.com, # 91 Summon(s) to soccerusa4you.com, # 92 Summon(s) to supercheapsoccer.com, # 93 Summon(s) to superstarkick.com, # 94 Summon(s) to toahk.com, # 95 Summon(s) to topjerseysorder.com, # 96 Summon(s) to tradeccc.net, # 97 Summon(s) to trikotdiscount.com, # 98 Summon(s) to usa-soccer-jersey.com, # 99 Summon(s) to uubest.com, # 100 Summon(s) to various-jersey-wholesale.com, # 101 Summon(s) to well-sports.com, # 102 Summon(s) to wholesale-from-china.com, # 103 Summon(s) to wholesalejerseysfromchina.com, # 104 Summon(s) to wholesalesoccercleats.com, # 105 Summon(s) to womenadidas.com, # 106 Summon(s) to world-jerseys.com, # 107 Summon(s) to world-soccer-shoes.com, # 108 Memorandum to zigtechreebokshoes.org)(Gaffigan, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: adidas AG et al v. Wu et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: world-jerseys.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: world-soccer-shoes.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: zigtechreebokshoes.org
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: well-sports.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: uubest.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: usa-soccer-jersey.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: various-jersey-wholesale.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: wholesalejerseysfromchina.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: wholesale-from-china.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: socceroutlets.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: soccershoes4you.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: womenadidas.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: wholesalesoccercleats.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: tradeccc.net
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: trikotdiscount.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: toahk.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: topjerseysorder.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: supercheapsoccer.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: superstarkick.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: soccershoesstores.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: soccerusa4you.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: soccer-cleats-shoes.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: soccerjerseycenter.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: shopsoccerjerseys.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: soccercleats4u.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: soccercleatsnike.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: soccercleatsshoes.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cheapkicksforsale.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cheapnbashoes.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: adidasshoes001.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: adidasshoessite.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: adidassmith.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: adidassuperstarshoes.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: adidastitanbounce.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: adidastour360.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: adidaswings.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: adidasxjeremyscott.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: airmaxshopchina.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: autobotshop.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: buyjerseysonline.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: buyjerseyswholesale.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: buyteamsportsuniforms.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: caminio.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ccmjersey.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: chaussures-nike-tn.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cheap001.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cheap999.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cheapjerseysfromchina.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: shopadicolor.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: reebokonlineoutlet.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: reebok-member.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: reebokeasytoneonline.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: reebok123.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ptjerseys.org
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ptjerseys.net
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ptjerseys.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: plentystock.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: outlet-jerseys.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: onlinesoccerboots.co.uk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: nikeshoes001.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: nike-mercurial-store.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: nikemercurialshoes.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: nba-home.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: nba-basketball-shoes.net
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: mercurialshoesoutlet.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: lowestbestexport.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: lovinadidas.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jerseys-googler.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jerseysfull.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jerseysfromchina.info
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jerseysfromchina.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jerseysforcheap.biz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jeremyscottwing.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jeremyscottsadidas.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: inthestyleshop.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: indoor-soccershoes.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ilove-shopping.org
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: helloadidas.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: gsdiscount.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: footballjerseys4sale.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: footballbootsuk.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: footballcleatsstore.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: fashion333.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: everysportuniforms.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cn-jerseys.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cheapshopping4u.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: adidassbounce.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: adidasscarpecalcio.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: adidasporschedesignde.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: adidas-originals.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: adidas-online-shop.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: adidasjp.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: adidasjswings.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: adidasjeremyscott.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: adidasf50shoes.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: adidasf50adizeroshop.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: adidas-f50-adizero.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: adidasempire.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: adidasbounces.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: adiclothing.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 888shop-jerseys.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4adidas.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2010shopjerseys.org
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2010shopjerseys.net
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danyu Wu
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: soccershoesproducts.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: soccershoesforsales.com
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reebok International Ltd.
Represented By: Stephen Michael Gaffigan
Represented By: Virgilio Gigante
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reebok International Limited
Represented By: Stephen Michael Gaffigan
Represented By: Virgilio Gigante
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: adidas America, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Michael Gaffigan
Represented By: Virgilio Gigante
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: adidas AG
Represented By: Virgilio Gigante
Represented By: Stephen Michael Gaffigan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: adidas International Marketing B.V.
Represented By: Virgilio Gigante
Represented By: Stephen Michael Gaffigan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]