Fifty-Six Hope Road Music Limited, a Bahamian corp. v. Booker et al Featured Case

Defendant: Bob Marley Movement of Jah People, Inc., The Bob Marley Heritage Corporation and Richard Booker
Plaintiff: Fifty-Six Hope Road Music Limited
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv24326
Filed: December 1, 2011
 
Court: Florida Southern District Court
Office: Miami Office
County: XX DONT USE THIS CODE
Presiding Judge: Marcia G. Cooke
Referring Judge: William C. Turnoff
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 29, 2013 61 Featured Case ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 60 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Bob Marley Movement of Jah People, Inc., The Bob Marley Heritage Corporation, Richard Booker. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 1/29/2013. (tm)
November 30, 2012 60 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice based on Settlement by Bob Marley Movement of Jah People, Inc., Richard Booker, The Bob Marley Heritage Corporation (Devine, Daniel)
November 19, 2012 59 Order Administratively Closing Case upon Notice of Settlement. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 11/19/2012. (tm)
November 8, 2012 58 Featured Case ORDER denying 34 Plaintiff's Request for Reimbursement Pursuant to FRCP 37(A)(5). Signed by Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff on 11/8/12. (lml)
November 7, 2012 57 NOTICE of Settlement by Bob Marley Movement of Jah People, Inc., Richard Booker, The Bob Marley Heritage Corporation (Devine, Daniel)
November 6, 2012 56 MOTION for Protective Order as to Notices of Deposition and Subpoenas Duces Tecum by Bob Marley Movement of Jah People, Inc., Richard Booker, The Bob Marley Heritage Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - NOD Sharien Fogle, # 2 Exhibit B - NOD Phil Klein, # 3 Exhibit C - NOD Richard Booker, # 4 Exhibit D - D - NOD Various Non-Parties, # 5 Exhibit E - Plaintiffs' Requests for Production)(Santucci, Michael) Modified Text on 11/7/2012 (ls).
November 2, 2012 55 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff: Motion Hearing held on 11/2/2012 re 34 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order and Notice of Motion MOTION for Reimbursement pursuant to FRCP 37(A)(5) filed by Fifty-Six Hope Road Music Limited. Motion addressed. Oral arguments heard. Court denies motion without prejudice. Written Order to follow. **APPEARANCES: Bruce G. Hermelee, Esq. present on behalf of the Plaintiff. Michael I. Santucci, Esq. and Daniel Devine, Esq. present on behalf of the Defendants. (Digital 14:24:34.) (Time: 2:00PM-2:35PM) (lw1) Modified text on 11/2/2012 (lw1).
October 23, 2012 54 Featured Case OMNIBUS ORDER deeming moot 33 Defendants' Motion to Compel; deeming moot 34 Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part 37 Plaintiff's Motion for Hearing. Motion Hearing on Plaintiff's fee request is set for 11/2/2012 at 02:00 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff. Signed by Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff on 10/23/12. (lml)
October 16, 2012 53 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 50 Motion for Extension of Time Fact Discovery due by 11/16/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 11/30/2012. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 10/16/2012. (tm)
October 2, 2012 52 NOTICE by Fifty-Six Hope Road Music Limited re 50 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to extend all pending deadlines and to stay discovery re 22 Scheduling Order, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,,, MOTION to Stay (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hermelee, Bruce)
October 2, 2012 51 Clerks Notice to Filer re 50 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to extend all pending deadlines and to stay discovery re 22 Scheduling Order, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,,, MOTION to Stay. Motion with Multiple Reliefs Filed as One Relief; ERROR - The Filer selected only one relief event and failed to select the additional corresponding events for each relief requested in the motion. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future filings must comply with the instructions in the CM/ECF Attorney User's Manual. (tp)
October 1, 2012 50 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to extend all pending deadlines and to stay discovery re 22 Scheduling Order, Order Referring Case to Mediation, by Fifty-Six Hope Road Music Limited. Responses due by 10/18/2012 (Hermelee, Bruce). Added MOTION to Stay on 10/2/2012 (tp).
August 16, 2012 49 Clerks Notice to Filer re 47 Response/Reply (Other). Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#48]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls)
August 16, 2012 48 REPLY to Response to Motion re 34 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order and Notice of Motion MOTION for Reimbursement pursuant to FRCP 37(A)(5) filed by Fifty-Six Hope Road Music Limited. (ls)(See Image at DE # 47 )
August 16, 2012 47 RESPONSE/REPLY to 34 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order and Notice of Motion MOTION for Reimbursement pursuant to FRCP 37(A)(5) by Fifty-Six Hope Road Music Limited. (Hermelee, Bruce)
August 6, 2012 46 RESPONSE to Motion re 33 MOTION to Compel Documents Responsive to Defendants' First Request For Production of Documents , 34 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order and Notice of Motion MOTION for Reimbursement pursuant to FRCP 37(A)(5) filed by Bob Marley Movement of Jah People, Inc., Richard Booker, The Bob Marley Heritage Corporation. Replies due by 8/16/2012. (Devine, Daniel)
July 26, 2012 45 Featured Case ORDER granting 44 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 34 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order and Notice of Motion for Reimbursement pursuant to FRCP 37(A)(5) and 33 MOTION to Compel Documents Responsive to Defendants' First Request For Production of Documents. Response/reply due by 8/6/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff on 7/26/2012. (gct)
July 26, 2012 44 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 33 MOTION to Compel Documents Responsive to Defendants' First Request For Production of Documents , 34 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order and Notice of Motion MOTION for Reimbursement pursuant to FRCP 37(A)(5) by Bob Marley Movement of Jah People, Inc., Richard Booker, The Bob Marley Heritage Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Devine, Daniel)
July 19, 2012 43 Featured Case ORDER granting 42 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 34 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order. Responses due by 7/26/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff on 7/19/2012. (gct)
July 19, 2012 42 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 34 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order and Notice of Motion MOTION for Reimbursement pursuant to FRCP 37(A)(5) by Bob Marley Movement of Jah People, Inc., Richard Booker, The Bob Marley Heritage Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Devine, Daniel)
July 16, 2012 41 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Paul A. Bost. re 40 Response in Opposition to Motion to Compel by Fifty-Six Hope Road Music Limited (Hermelee, Bruce)
July 16, 2012 40 RESPONSE in Opposition re 33 MOTION to Compel Documents Responsive to Defendants' First Request For Production of Documents filed by Fifty-Six Hope Road Music Limited. (Hermelee, Bruce)
July 5, 2012 39 Clerks Notice to Filer re 37 Response in Support of Motion. Wrong Event Selected - Document is a Motion; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. A motion event must always be selected when filing a motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls)
July 5, 2012 38 Clerks Notice to Filer re 34 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order . Motion with Multiple Reliefs Filed as One Relief; ERROR - The Filer selected only one relief event and failed to select the additional corresponding events for each relief requested in the motion. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future filings must comply with the instructions in the CM/ECF Attorney User's Manual. (ls)
July 2, 2012 37 MOTION for Hearing/Oral Argument re 34 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order and Notice of Motion, MOTION for Reimbursement pursuant to FRCP 37(A)(5) filed by Fifty-Six Hope Road Music Limited. (Hermelee, Bruce) Modified to convert document to a motion on 7/5/2012 (ls).
July 2, 2012 36 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Paul A. Bost. re 34 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order and Notice of Motion, MOTION for Reimbursement pursuant to FRCP 37(A)(5) by Fifty-Six Hope Road Music Limited (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit N)(Hermelee, Bruce) Modified Text on 7/5/2012 (ls).
July 2, 2012 35 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Doreen Crujeiras. re 34 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order by Fifty-Six Hope Road Music Limited (Hermelee, Bruce)
July 2, 2012 34 Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order and Notice of Motion by Fifty-Six Hope Road Music Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hermelee, Bruce). Added MOTION for Reimbursement pursuant to FRCP 37(A)(5) on 7/5/2012 (ls).
July 2, 2012 33 MOTION to Compel Documents Responsive to Defendants' First Request For Production of Documents by Bob Marley Movement of Jah People, Inc., Richard Booker, The Bob Marley Heritage Corporation. Responses due by 7/19/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Affidavit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit)(Devine, Daniel)
June 12, 2012 Attorney Allison Sinclair Lovelady terminated. (ls)(per DE #32)
June 12, 2012 32 NOTICE by Bob Marley Movement of Jah People, Inc., Richard Booker, The Bob Marley Heritage Corporation of Requesting Removal of Attorney of Record (Santucci, Michael) Modified on 6/13/2012 (ls).
May 17, 2012 31 Featured Case ORDER granting 30 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff on 5/17/2012. (gct)
May 16, 2012 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests by Bob Marley Movement of Jah People, Inc., Richard Booker, The Bob Marley Heritage Corporation. Responses due by 6/4/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sinclair, Allison)
May 4, 2012 29 NOTICE of Mediator Selection: Rodney A. Max, Esq. selected. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation)(Santucci, Michael)
April 30, 2012 28 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 27 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Notice of Mediator. The parties shall file the notice on or before May 4, 2012. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 4/30/2012. (scy)
April 30, 2012 27 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Mediator re 26 Order Striking,, by Bob Marley Movement of Jah People, Inc., Richard Booker, Fifty-Six Hope Road Music Limited. Responses due by 5/17/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sinclair, Allison)
April 25, 2012 26 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER STRIKING 23 Notice (Other) filed by Fifty-Six Hope Road Music Limited, 24 Notice of Mediator Selection filed by Fifty-Six Hope Road Music Limited. The parties cannot unilaterally select Magistrate Judge Turnoff as a mediator in this matter. If the parties cannot afford mediation, they may file a motion with the Court to have mediation before a magistrate judge. In other words, the parties must seek leave to mediate before a magistrate judge, which they have not done in this matter. The parties shall file a new notice of mediator selection on or before April 30, 2012. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 4/25/2012. (scy)
April 20, 2012 25 Clerks Notice to Filer re 23 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#24]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls)
April 19, 2012 24 NOTICE of Mediator Selection: Magistrate Turnoff selected.(ls)(See Image at DE # 23 )
April 19, 2012 23 NOTICE by Fifty-Six Hope Road Music Limited re 22 Scheduling Order, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,,, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation)(Geffin, Alan)
April 3, 2012 22 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 4/8/2013 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke., Calendar Call set for 4/3/2013 03:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke., Amended Pleadings due by 7/20/2012., Expert Discovery due by 11/30/2012., Fact Discovery due by 10/19/2012., Joinder of Parties due by 7/20/2012., Dispositive Motions due by 10/26/2012., Pretrial Stipulation due by 2/22/2013.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation Deadline 12/14/2012.. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 4/3/2012. (im)
March 7, 2012 21 Featured Case ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND DISMISSING CERTAIN COUNTS OF COUTERCLAIMANTS' COUNTERCLAIM re 19 Stipulation of Dismissal, filed by Bob Marley Movement of Jah People, Inc., The Bob Marley Heritage Corporation, Richard Booker. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 3/7/2012. (tm)
March 1, 2012 20 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (jc)
February 16, 2012 19 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Voluntary) with Prejudice of Counterclaims VI, VII, and VIII, and Withdrawal with Prejudice of Related Affirmative Defenses by Bob Marley Movement of Jah People, Inc., Richard Booker, The Bob Marley Heritage Corporation (Santucci, Michael)
February 15, 2012 18 Featured Case ORDER granting 16 and 17 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jill M. Pietrini, Esq., and Paul Bost, Esq., Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff on 2/15/12. (lml)
February 15, 2012 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Paul Bost. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 2260. (ksa)
February 15, 2012 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jill M. Pietrini. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 2260. (ksa)
February 10, 2012 15 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Bob Marley Movement of Jah People, Inc., Richard Booker, The Bob Marley Heritage Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List of Dates, # 2 Exhibit Magistrate Disposition, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Order of Referral to Mediation, # 4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Santucci, Michael)
February 9, 2012 14 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 13 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Scheduling Report. The parties shall file their Joint Scheduling Report on or before February 10, 2012. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 2/9/2012. (scy)
February 7, 2012 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to file Joint Scheduling Report and Joint Proposed Order re 8 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report by Bob Marley Movement of Jah People, Inc., Richard Booker, Fifty-Six Hope Road Music Limited, The Bob Marley Heritage Corporation. Responses due by 2/24/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Priore, Joseph)
January 31, 2012 12 RESPONSE/REPLY to 11 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Fifty-Six Hope Road Music Limited. (Hermelee, Bruce)
January 10, 2012 11 Defendants' ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand , First COUNTERCLAIM for Declaratory Judgments and Cancellation of Trademark Registrations against Fifty-Six Hope Road Music Limited by The Bob Marley Heritage Corporation, Bob Marley Movement of Jah People, Inc., Richard Booker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit TM Application, # 2 Exhibit TM Application)(Santucci, Michael)
December 22, 2011 10 Featured Case ORDER granting 9 Partially Agreed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond RE: 1 Complaint by All Defendants. Responses due by 1/9/12. Signed by Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff on 12/22/11. (lml)
December 21, 2011 9 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints re 1 Complaint,, Partially Agreed by Bob Marley Movement of Jah People, Inc., Richard Booker, The Bob Marley Heritage Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sinclair, Allison)
December 14, 2011 8 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/14/2011. (tm)
December 14, 2011 7 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff for Pretrial Proceedings. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/14/2011. (tm)
December 1, 2011 6 Clerks Motion and Order for Appointment of Nelson Navarrepe as Process Server. Signed by Deputy Clerk (ls)
December 1, 2011 5 Plaintiff's MOTION for Appointment of Special Process Server by Fifty-Six Hope Road Music Limited, a Bahamian corp.. Responses due by 12/19/2011 (Hermelee, Bruce)
December 1, 2011 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (jc)
December 1, 2011 3 Summons Issued as to Bob Marley Movement of Jah People, Inc., Richard Booker, The Bob Marley Heritage Corporation. (jc)
December 1, 2011 2 Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke (jc)
December 1, 2011 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 113C-4273892, filed by Fifty-Six Hope Road Music Limited, a Bahamian corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summon(s) Richard Booker, # 3 Summon(s) Bob Marley Movement of Jah People, Inc., # 4 Summon(s) The Bob Marley Heritage Corporation, # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit D, # 9 Exhibit E (Part 1), # 10 Exhibit E (Part 2), # 11 Exhibit E (Part 3), # 12 Exhibit F)(Hermelee, Bruce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Fifty-Six Hope Road Music Limited, a Bahamian corp. v. Booker et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Marley Movement of Jah People, Inc.
Represented By: Allison Sinclair
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bob Marley Heritage Corporation
Represented By: Allison Sinclair
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Booker
Represented By: Allison Sinclair
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fifty-Six Hope Road Music Limited
Represented By: Bruce Grant Hermelee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]