Matthews v. United States

Plaintiff: David G. Matthews
Defendant: United States
 
Case Number: 1:2007cv00030
Filed: November 9, 2007
 
Court: Guam District Court
Office: Hagatna Office
County: Guam
Presiding Judge: Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 9, 2010 114 Featured Case Opinion and Order Re: Disqualification of Attorney David Hopkins. Request to disqualify Hopkins denied. 109 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and 110 Motion to Shorten Time deemed MOOT. (related document(s): 97 Motion for Injunctive Relief). Signed by Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood on 2/9/2010. (fad, )
January 10, 2011 175 Featured Case Order denying 151 Motion to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr on 1/10/2011. (fad, )
January 10, 2011 176 Featured Case Order denying 155 Motion to Compel Defendant to Provide Production. Because it would not be an additional hardship to provide the Plaintiff with the document number, the court orders the Government to provide the Plaintiff with said number. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr. on 1/10/2011. (fad, )
August 5, 2011 214 Featured Case Opinion and Order Re: 195 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. The court lacks subject matter jurisdiction and the case is hereby DISMISSED. Signed by Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood on 8/5/2011. (fad, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Matthews v. United States
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David G. Matthews
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]