Reyes v. Doe Defendants 1-100

Plaintiff: Jesse James Cruz Reyes
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-100
 
Case Number: 1:2008cv00005
Filed: May 16, 2008
 
Court: Guam District Court
Office: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability Office
County: Guam
Presiding Judge: Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2013 186 Opinion or Order of the Court Order adopting 179 Report and Recommendations; granting in part 96 Motion to Dismiss; granting 152 Motion for Summary Judgment. (related document(s): 180 Objection to Report and Recommendation). Signed by Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood on 9/30/2013. (fad, )
December 13, 2010 74 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order Re 46 Motion for Summary Judgment. Guam Insurance Adjusters, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in its entirety. Signed by Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood on 12/13/2010. (fad, )
December 15, 2010 76 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order granting 50 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant DCK Pacific Guam, LLC. Counts VI and Count VIII are dismissed without leave to amend. The remaining counts are dismissed with leave to amend. Plaintiff shall file his Third Amended Complaint by 3:00 PM on 01/06/2011. Signed by Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood on 12/15/2010. (fad, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Reyes v. Doe Defendants 1-100
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse James Cruz Reyes
Represented By: Delia Sablan Lujan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-100
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]