Arnold v. Melwani et al

Plaintiff: Richard T. Arnold
Defendant: Manu P. Melwani, Anita Melwani, Lawrence J. Teker, The Superior Court of Guam and The Supreme Court of Guam
 
Case Number: 1:2009cv00030
Filed: December 22, 2009
 
Court: Guam District Court
Office: Hagatna Office
County: Guam
Referring Judge: Joaquin V.E. Manibusan
Presiding Judge: Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2011 112 Featured Case Order denying 95 Motion to Amend Judgment, Request for Oral Argument; denying 98 Motion for Reconsideration under FRCP 59(e); denying 99 Amended Rule 60(b)(4) Motion to Vacate Certain Orders, Judgments and Opinions of the Superior and Supreme C ourts of Guam; denying 100 Motion to Vacate Judgments of the Superior Court in SP0057-07 and Affirming Opinions of the Supreme Court of Guam Under FRCP Rule 60(b)(4); denying 101 Notice of Constitutional Question Under FRCP Rule 5.1; denying 102 Motion for Order and Stipulation of Service. Signed by Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood on 8/31/2011. (fad)
September 20, 2012 169 Featured Case Order denying 114 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 123 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 164 Motion to Vacate. Signed by Designated Judge David A. Ezra on 09/19/2012 in Honolulu, Hawaii. (fad, )
January 10, 2013 194 Featured Case Order granting 133 Motion to Dismiss; granting 135 Motion to Declare Plaintiff a Vexatious Litigant; granting 158 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to submit any filing that names any of the former or current judicial defendants in this case to the clerk of court for pre-filing review as described in Part III.D. of this Order. This Order shall in no way be construed as precluding Plaintiff from filing an appeal of this Court's Order to the Ninth Circuit or from seeking any relief from the that court. Signed by Designated Judge David A. Ezra on 1/9/2013 in San Antonio, Texas. (fad, )
May 14, 2010 44 Featured Case Opinion and Order denying 25 Motion for Recusal. Signed by Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood on 5/14/2010. (fad, )
August 4, 2010 58 Featured Case Opinion and Order denying 46 Motion for Reconsideration and Motion to Correct Court's Factual Background. Signed by Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood on 08/04/2010. (fad, )
March 31, 2011 92 Featured Case Order granting 37 Motion to Dismiss filed by The Superior Court of Guam, The Supreme Court of Guam; granting 18 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. In light of this ruling, all pending motions, including the one filed today 91 are hereby considered moot. The Clerk's Office is directed to issue a judgment in accordance with this order. Signed by Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood on 3/31/2011. (fad, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Arnold v. Melwani et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard T. Arnold
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manu P. Melwani
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anita Melwani
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence J. Teker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Superior Court of Guam
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Supreme Court of Guam
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]