Dewitz v. GTA

Defendant: GTA
Plaintiff: Angela Dewitz
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00036
Filed: November 28, 2011
 
Court: Guam District Court
Office: Hagatna Office
County: Guam
Presiding Judge: Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood
Referring Judge: Joaquin V.E. Manibusan
 
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 9, 2014 145 Opinion or Order of the Court Report And Recommendations re 94 Motion to Dismiss Count Three of the Second Amended Complaint (Breach of Employment Agreement) filed by Teleguam Holdings, LLC. The below-signed magistrate judge hereby recommends that Chief Judge Manglona grant the Motion to Dismiss Count Three of the SAC with prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 4/23/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr on 4/9/2014. (fad, ) **Modified on 4/9/2014 to edit docket text** (fad, ).
April 10, 2014 147 Opinion or Order of the Court Report And Recommendations re 100 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Teleguam Holdings, LLC. The court recommends Chief Judge Manglona GRANT Teleguam's Motion for Summary Judgment as to the ADA claims of discrimination based on certain discrete acts since such acts are time-barred, and DENY the Motion for Summary Judgment in all other respects. Objections to R&R due by 4/24/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr on 4/10/2014. (fad, )
July 3, 2014 193 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Re: 145 Report And Recommendations re 94 Motion to Dismiss Count Three of the Second Amended Complaint (Breach of Employment Agreement) and Report And Recommendations re 100 Motion for Summary Judgment. The report and re commendations are adopted in full. The court sustains Teleguam's objections on adverse employment actions (Part III.B.2) and therefore grants summary judgment to the effect that failure to give notice of the termination is not an adverse employ ment act under the ADA. All other objections are overruled. DeWitz's third claim, breach of the employment agreement, is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 7/3/2014. (related document(s): 158 Objection to Report and Recommendation, 159 Objection to Report and Recommendation). (fad, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Dewitz v. GTA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GTA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Dewitz
Represented By: Wayson W. S. Wong
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]