Clark v. Internal Revenue Service

 
Case Number: 1:2006cv00544
Filed: October 4, 2006
 
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Hawaii Office
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: SAMUEL P KING
Referring Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
 
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 7, 2011 299 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: re 253 , 273 .. Signed by MARVIN E. ASPEN on 1/7/11. (eps ) -- ... finding no bad faith, or prejudice to Clark, under these circumstances and decline to sanction Defendants CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
May 2, 2011 320 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECUSAL 316 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 5/2/11. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
July 14, 2011 331 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECUSAL AND FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECUSAL DATED APRIL 19, 2011 323 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 7/14/11. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mai l on the date of this docket entry Modified on 7/14/2011 ~ A copy of this order has been served by first class mail to Mona Watson Clark at 4350 Kai Ikena Dr., Kalaheo, HI 96741, the addressed referenced on the docket sheet. (emt, ).
July 26, 2011 332 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by MARVIN E. ASPEN on 7/26/2011. ~ On December 16, 2010, we concluded a four-day bench trial on Plaintiff Mona Watson Clark's only remaining claim, Count V of her fi rst amended complaint. In Count V, Plaintiff alleged that the Defendant, the Internal Revenue Service , made unauthorized disclosures of tax return information pertaining to her great uncle's estate. Plaintiff is a beneficiary and the curr ent executor of the estate. *Based on our findings of fact, we conclude that Plaintiff failed to bring her claim within the time allotted by the applicable statute of limitations. Because the statute of limitations is jurisdictional, we have no juri sdiction to rule on the merits of Plaintiff's claim. In the event we have jurisdiction, we conclude that Plaintiff has failed to meet her burden of proof and judgment for the IRS is appropriate. Plaintiff's claim pursuant to 26 U.S.C.  7; 7431 is dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. All other claims having been resolved, this case is terminated. (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifi cations received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry Modified on 7/26/2011: Mona Watson Clark (mona.watson.clark@gmail.com) was also served via nef (bcc) and through counsel. (ecs, ). Modified on 7/26/2011 (ecs, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Clark v. Internal Revenue Service
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]