Shaughnessy v. KC Rainbow Development Corporation, LLC

Defendant: KC Rainbow Development Corporation, LLC
Plaintiff: Brian Shaughnessy
 
Case Number: 1:2009cv00051
Filed: February 5, 2009
 
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Accommodations Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: ALAN C KAY
Referring Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:3601 Fair Housing Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 12, 2011 171 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING KC RAINBOW DEVELOPMENT CO., LLC'S MOTION TO BIFURCATE AND ARCHITECTS HAWAII, LTD.S JOINDER 140 , 152 . Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI on 1/12/2011. ~ The Court therefore FINDS that bifurcating Plaintiff's FHA claims from the Contractual claims will be more convenient, expeditious, and economical, and that bifurcation is warranted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(b). KC Rainbow's Motion to Bifurcate, filed December 3, 2010, and AHL& #039;s joinder in the Motion, filed December 22, 2010, are HEREBY GRANTED. The trial of Plaintiff's FHA claims will begin on the scheduled February 15, 2011 trial date. The Court will hold a scheduling conference to set a trial date for the Cont ractual claims. (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
February 10, 2011 190 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING KC RAINBOW DEVELOPMENT CO., LLC'S MOTION TO DISQUALIFY MICHAEL L. BIEHL, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT ARCHITECTS HAWAII, LTD. re 163 . Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI on 2/10/11. (eps ) -- The Court DIRECT S the Clerk's Office to immediatelyterminate Mr. Biehl as AHL's counsel of record in this case. If AHL appeals this order to Senior District Judge Alan C. Kay, AHL can request that he stay the effect of this order during the pendency of the appeal. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
August 8, 2011 233 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 214 , 230 . Signed by JUDGE ALAN C KAY on 8/8/11. (eps) -- re: Petition For Approval of Good Faith SettlementCERTIFICATE OF SERV ICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
January 15, 2010 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT/THIRD-PARTY PLAINTIFF KC RAINBOW DEVELOPMENT CO., LLC'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT AGAINST DEFENDANT/THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT ARCHITECTS HAWAII, LTD. re 37 .. Signed by JUDGE ALAN C K AY on 1/15/10. (eps ) -- the Court DENIES KC Rainbow's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as it relates to claims for breach of contract (Count I) and breach of the implied covenant of good faith and fair dealing (Count II). In addition, the Court DENIES KC Rainbow's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for declaratory relief (Count IV). CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Shaughnessy v. KC Rainbow Development Corporation, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KC Rainbow Development Corporation, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Shaughnessy
Represented By: Lunsford D. Phillips
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]