Diamond Resort Hawaii Corporation et al v. Bay West Kailua Bay, LLC

Plaintiff: Diamond Resort Hawaii Corporation, Diamond Management, Inc. and Janic Corporation
Defendant: Bay West Kailua Bay, LLC
Case Number: 1:2010cv00117
Filed: March 3, 2010
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: UNASSIGNED
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 24, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS 11 . Signed by JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA on 8/24/2010. [Order follows hearing on Motion 11 held 8/23/2010; Minutes- docket entry no. 16 ] (afc) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
February 25, 2011 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 29 ; AND (2) DENYING DEFENDANT'S RULE 56(d) REQUEST 52 . ~ Plaintiffs' are directed to file a separate motion for damages ~ Signed by JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA on 2/25/2011. (a fc) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). All Case Participants are registered to receive electronic notifications. (afc)
July 1, 2011 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DAMAGES 58 . Signed by JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA on 7/1/2011. [Order follows hearing held 7/1/2011. Minutes: doc no. 66 ]. (afc)CERTIFIC ATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). All Participants are registered to receive electronic notifications.
October 25, 2011 93 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION THAT PLANTIFFS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS BE GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART re: 70 . ~ "The Court RECOMMENDS that Plaintiffs be awarded $195,931.27 in attorneys' fees and co sts." ~ Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 10/24/2011. (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). All participants are registered to receive electronic notifications.
November 14, 2011 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION 93 . Signed by JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA on 11/14/2011. [Order adopts the "Findings and Recommendation that Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs b e Granted in Part and Denied in Part."] (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diamond Resort Hawaii Corporation et al v. Bay West Kailua Bay, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diamond Resort Hawaii Corporation
Represented By: Andrew L. Pepper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diamond Management, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew L. Pepper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janic Corporation
Represented By: Andrew L. Pepper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay West Kailua Bay, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]