Northern Trust, NA v. Wolfe

Plaintiff: Northern Trust, NA
Defendant: Kenneth I. Wolfe
Case Number: 1:2011cv00531
Filed: August 30, 2011
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: BARRY M. KURREN
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2013 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 110 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 9/18/2013. (gab, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
October 8, 2013 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION re: 109 . Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 10/8/2013. ~ Order adopts the "FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO GRANT IN PART AND DENY IN PART PLAINTIFF NOR THERN TRUST, NA'S MOTION FOR CONFIRMATION OF SALE, DIRECTING DISTRIBUTION OF PROCEEDS, FOR DEFICIENCY JUDGMENT, WRIT OF POSSESSION AND DISPOSAL OF PERSONAL PROPERTY FILED MAY 16, 2013 [Doc. # 97 ]; EXHIBIT 'A'." ~ (afc) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications will be served by first class mail on October 9, 2013.
May 31, 2012 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 17 NORTHERN TRUST'S MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT KENNETH I. WOLFE'S COUNTERCLAIM AND DENYING 20 NORTHERN TRUST'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO THE COMPLAINT FILED HEREIN ON AUGUST 30, 2011, INTERLOCUTORY DECREE OF FORECLOSURE, AND ORDER OF SALE: "To the extent that the Court has dismissed some of the counts in the Counterclaim without prejudice, the Court GRANTS Wolfe leave to submit a motion to the magistrate judge seeking permission to file an amend ed counterclaim addressing those claims. This Court CAUTIONS Wolfe that, if he fails to file his motion by June 28, 2012, the claims which this Court has dismissed without prejudice will be automatically dismissed with prejudice. Further, if Wolfe� 39;s amended counterclaim does not address the deficiencies identified in this Order, the claims which this Court has dismissed without prejudice may be dismissed with prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED." Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on May 31, 2012. (bbb, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
January 31, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING NORTHERN TRUST'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO THE COMPLAINT, INTERLOCUTORY DECREE OF FORECLOSURE, AND ORDER OF SALE 41 AND GRANTING NORTHERN TRUST'S MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT KENNETH I. WOLFE'S FIRST AMENDED COU NTERCLAIM 57 . Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 1/31/2013. Excerpt of Order: re: Defendant Kenneth I. Wolfe's request for extension of time to respond to the motions [Rule 56(d) Continuance]: Denied (pp. 37-38). Ex cerpt of Conclusion: "Northern Trust is directed to provide a proposed Foreclosure Decree and foreclosure Commissioner to the Court by March 1, 2013." [Order follows hearing held 1/22/2013. Minutes of hearing: doc no. 74 ]. (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 18, 2013 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT/COUNTERCLAIMANT KENNETH I. WOLFE'S MOTION FOR RELIEF UNDER FRCP RULES 59(e) AND 60(b) re: 77 . Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 3/18/2013. (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEPartic ipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
April 30, 2013 91 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO GRANT IN PART AND DENY IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS re: 79 . Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 4/30/2013. (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEPa rticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
May 16, 2013 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION re: 91 . Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 5/16/2013. ~ Order adopts the "Findings and Recommendation to Grant in Part and Deny in Part Plaintiff 9;s Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs" ~ (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northern Trust, NA v. Wolfe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern Trust, NA
Represented By: Jonathan W.Y. Lai
Represented By: Ashley R. Masuoka
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth I. Wolfe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]