Kaeo-Tomaselli v. Pi'ikoi Recovery House for Women et al

Defendant: Pi'iko'i House, Evalani Souza, Pi'ikoi Recovery House for Women and TJ Mahoney and Associates
Plaintiff: Dion'e Kaeo-Tomaselli
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00670
Filed: November 1, 2011
 
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: BARRY M. KURREN
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 2, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 14 MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND DISMISSING DEFENDANT T.J. MAHONEY AND ASSOCIATES. Signed by District JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on February 2, 2012. (bbb, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants regist ered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications, TJ Mahoney and Associates @ 524 Kaaahi Street, Honolulu HI 96817 were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry. USM also served via NEF on 02/02/2012.
August 29, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT IWALANI SOUZA'S MOTION TO DISMISS 32 . Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 8/29/2012. (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
November 30, 2012 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER RULES 12(b) AND 12(f) re: 40 . Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 11/30/2012. (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electroni c notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
November 16, 2011 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING 1 COMPLAINT IN PART: "IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) The Complaint is DISMISSED in part for failure to state a claim. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(b) & 1915A(b)(1). Specifically, Defendants Pi'ikoi House and Chavez are DISMISSED. Plaintiff's claims as alleged against Defendant Souza state a claim and shall proceed. (2) Plaintiff is GRANTED until December 15, 2011, to either file a proposed amended complaint that cures the deficiencies as noted above or be deemed to have waived the dismissed claims and defendants and to have chosen to proceed only with her claims Defendant Souza. If Plaintiff does not file an amended complaint by December 15, 2011, the court will direct service of the Complaint on Defendant Souza. (3) The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a form prisoner civil rights complaint to Plaintiff so that she may comply with the directions in this Order." Signed by District JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on November 16, 2011. (bbb, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not r egistered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry. a prisoner civil rights complaint form has been served upon Pltf Kaeo-Tomaselli by first class mail on the date of this docket entry.
January 31, 2013 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re: 60 . Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 1/31/2013. ~ "Claims against [Jennifer] Butts are DISMISSED...." ~ (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEPart icipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
September 17, 2013 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 79 - Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 9/17/13. "Defendants' Motion for Summary judgment is GRANTED as to Plaintiff's federal claims. The court decl ines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Plaintiff's remaining state law claim. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment and terminate this action." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipa nts registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Iwalani Souza, Jennifer Butts and Dion'e Kaeo-Tomaselli shall be served by first class mail at the addresses of record on September 18, 2013.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Kaeo-Tomaselli v. Pi'ikoi Recovery House for Women et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pi'iko'i House
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evalani Souza
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pi'ikoi Recovery House for Women
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TJ Mahoney and Associates
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dion'e Kaeo-Tomaselli
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]