Mettias v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Christina Mettias
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2012cv00527
Filed: September 24, 2012
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Referring Judge: KEVIN S.C. CHANG
Presiding Judge: ALAN C KAY
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 14, 2014 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AS TO PLAINTIFFS' INFORMED CONSENT CLAIM re: 91 . Signed by JUDGE ALAN C KAY on 10/14/2014. [Written Order follows hearing held on 09/29/2014 on Motion to Dismiss. Minutes of hearing: doc no. 97 . (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
January 15, 2015 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE, AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE re 101 , 107 , 109 - Signed by JUDGE ALAN C KAY on 1/15/2015. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 6, 2015 206 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by JUDGE ALAN C KAY on 3/6/2015. Government's Motion in Limine No. 1, doc no. 132 : DENIED.Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 1, doc no. 136 : GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. P laintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 4, doc no. 139 : DENIED.[Written Order follows hearing held 2/19/2015 on Plaintiffs Motion in Limine No. 1 (doc 136 ). Minutes of 2/19/2015 hearing: doc no. 185 . Written order also fol lows the hearing held 2/23/2015 on Government's Motion in Limine No. 1 (doc 132 ), and Plaintiffs Motion in Limine No. 4 (taken under advisement on 2/19/2015; minutes of hearing 185 ). Minutes of 2/23/2015 hearing: doc no. 187 ]. (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
April 21, 2015 235 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT, CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, AND DECISION - Signed by JUDGE ALAN C KAY on 4/21/2015. "And now, following the conclusion of a bench trial in this matter, and in accordance with the foregoing findings of facts a nd conclusions of law, it is hereby ordered that judgment shall enter in favor of Plaintiffs and against the United States in the above matter in the amount of $4,150,307 to Plaintiff Christina Mettias, and $100,000 to Plaintiff Christina Mettias as next friend of her minor son, N.M." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mettias v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Mettias
Represented By: Clare E. Connors
Represented By: Mark S. Davis
Represented By: Michael K. Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]