Tierney

Plaintiff: Michael C. Tierney
Case Number: 1:2012cv00532
Filed: September 26, 2012
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Referring Judge: KEVIN S.C. CHANG
Presiding Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND ALL PENDING MOTIONS re 9 ; 10 ; 11 ; 12 ; 14 - - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 10/24/12. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Michael C. Tierney shall be served by first class mail at the address of record on October 25, 2012.
November 9, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Reconsideration 16 . Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 11/8/12. (gls, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
October 2, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court DISMISSAL ORDER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 10/1/12. "Accordingly, the Complaint and action are DISMISSED without prejudice. If Plaintiff wishes to reassert these claims in the future, he may do so by concurrently submitting the entire $350.00 filing fee when he files the action. The Clerk of Court shall close this case. All pending motion are DENIED." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Michael C. Tierney served by first class mail at the address of record on October 2, 2012.
October 16, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re 7 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 10/16/12. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Michael C. Tierney shall be served by first class mail at the address of record on October 17, 2012.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tierney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael C. Tierney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]