Randolph Divisions Inc. et al v. Apple Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Randolph Divisions Inc. and HearPod, Inc.
Defendant: Apple Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00148
Filed: March 28, 2013
 
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: BARRY M. KURREN
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
June 14, 2013 9 NOTICE of Dismissal Without Prejudice HearPod, Inc., Randolph Divisions Inc.. (Schraff, Paul)
May 30, 2013 8 EO: Per Paul A. Schraff's request, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 7/1/2013 is CONTINUED to 9:30AM on 10/7/2013 before Judge BARRY M. KURREN. Scheduling Conference Statements are due 9/30/2013. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(kur2)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
May 13, 2013 7 Featured Case ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASES re 6 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 5/10/13. "This order supersedes any case assignments submitted this week in these cases." PLEASE REFLECT NEW CASE NUMBER CV 13-00148 DKW-BMK ON ALL FURTHER FILINGS. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
May 10, 2013 6 Featured Case ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASES. Case reassigned to JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON for all further proceedings. JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI no longer assigned to case Please reflect new case number CV 13-00148 DKW-BMK on all further pleadings ). Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 5/10/13. (gab, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 28, 2013 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Randolph Divisions Inc., and HearPod, Inc. (afc)
March 28, 2013 3 Filing fee: $ 350.00, receipt number HI007443 re 1 Complaint. (afc)
March 28, 2013 2 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00AM on 7/1/2013 before Judge BARRY M. KURREN. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 3/28/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Corporate Disclosure Memo) (afc)
March 28, 2013 1 COMPLAINT FOR TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT, UNFAIR COMPETITION AND DILUTION against Apple Inc. - filed by Randolph Divisions Inc., HearPod, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Demand for Jury Trial, # 2 Summons (issued), # 3 Civil Cover Sheet) (afc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Randolph Divisions Inc. et al v. Apple Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randolph Divisions Inc.
Represented By: Paul A. Schraff
Represented By: William G. Meyer, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HearPod, Inc.
Represented By: William G. Meyer, III
Represented By: Paul A. Schraff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]