Faith Action For Community Equity et al v. State of Hawaii et al

Plaintiff: Faith Action For Community Equity, John Doe #1 and Jane Doe #1
Defendant: State of Hawaii, Hawaii Department of Transportation and Glenn Okimoto
Case Number: 1:2013cv00450
Filed: September 6, 2013
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
Referring Judge: RICHARD L. PUGLISI
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 20, 2015 151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING SECOND MOTION TO DISMISS re 123 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 2/20/2015. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
February 23, 2015 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING COUNTERMOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 126 , 136 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 2/23/2015. "A question of fact exists as to whether HDOT intentionally discriminated against people of vari ous national origins. This questions of fact precludes the countermotions for summary judgment. The parties are ordered to contact the Magistrate Judge assigned to this case to schedule a settlement conference at the earliest available date." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
April 20, 2015 202 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO CERTIFY CLASS UNDER RULE 23(B)(2) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE re 148 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 4/20/2015. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registe red to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
May 5, 2015 249 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFIRMING MAGISTRATE JUDGE ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO ALTER THE RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER TO ALLOW THE DEPOSITION OF REBECCA GARNDER re 200 , 225 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 5/5/2015. &q uot;The court affirms Magistrate Judge Puglisi's order of April 14, 2015, denying Faith Action's request to modify the Rule 16 Scheduling Order to allow Faith Action to take the deposition of Rebecca Gardner." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
January 29, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) AFFIRMING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S DENIAL OF LEAVE TO PROCEED ANONYMOUSLY AND (2) DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT re 37 ; 44 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 1/29/2014. &quo t;The Magistrate Judge's order denying Plaintiffs leave to proceed anonymously is affirmed. Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file an amended Complaint is denied. Any new motion for leave or stipulation to the filing of an amended Comp laint must be submitted no later than February 19, 2014, and either document must include as an attachment the proposed amended pleading." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to re ceive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
April 28, 2014 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS ORGANIZATIONAL PLAINTIFF FOR LACK OF STANDING AND MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re 61 ; 62 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 4/28/2014. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF S ERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faith Action For Community Equity et al v. State of Hawaii et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faith Action For Community Equity
Represented By: Paul Alston
Represented By: Claire Wong Black
Represented By: M. Victor Geminiani
Represented By: James B. Rogers
Represented By: Gavin K. Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe #1
Represented By: Paul Alston
Represented By: Claire Wong Black
Represented By: M. Victor Geminiani
Represented By: James B. Rogers
Represented By: Gavin K. Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe #1
Represented By: Paul Alston
Represented By: Claire Wong Black
Represented By: M. Victor Geminiani
Represented By: James B. Rogers
Represented By: Gavin K. Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Hawaii
Represented By: John F. Molay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaii Department of Transportation
Represented By: John F. Molay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Okimoto
Represented By: John F. Molay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.