United States of America v. Zabka et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Robert K Zabka, Debra Zabka, Brookstone Hospitality Limited Partnership, Antiques Limited Partnership, ZFP Limited Partnership, Prairie State Bank and Trust, First Mid-Illinois Bank & Trust, Bank of America N A and Eleos LLC
Case Number: 1:2010cv01078
Filed: March 2, 2010
Court: Illinois Central District Court
Office: Peoria Office
County: Coles
Presiding Judge: Michael M. Mihm
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402 IRS: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 27, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 7/27/10. Defendant's 13 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Gorman for further proceedings. SEE FULL ORDER. (FDT, ilcd)
February 14, 2011 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Government's 56 Motion to Dismiss. The Zabkas are granted leave to file Second Amended Counterclaims curing the identified deficiency within 14 days ( Miscellaneous Deadline 2/28/2011) from the date of this Order. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 2/14/2011. (RK, ilcd)
February 25, 2011 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 2/25/11. The United States Government has established a prima facie case of liability for amounts due on assessment for the years 1996 and 1997. The Zabkas have not rebutted the validity of the assessments a nd are barred from challenging the correctness of the assessments. Consequently, they are liable to the Government based on unpaid assessments of federal income tax, penalties, and interest, in the amount of $834,476.00 for 1996 and $934,9 82.26 for 1997, each plus interest and other statutory additions accruing from and after April 15, 2010. Therefore, for the reasons set forth above, Plaintiffs 19 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED, and Defendants 33 Motion for Telephonic Oral Argument is DENIED. Defendants 28 Motion to Compel is DENIED, as it is premised upon the assertion that the Form 3430s produced by the Government are insufficient. (FDT, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Zabka et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Douglas W Snoeyenbos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert K Zabka
Represented By: Brent A Winters
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Zabka
Represented By: Brent A Winters
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookstone Hospitality Limited Partnership
Represented By: Brent A Winters
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antiques Limited Partnership
Represented By: Brent A Winters
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZFP Limited Partnership
Represented By: Brent A Winters
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prairie State Bank and Trust
Represented By: Mariann Pogge
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Mid-Illinois Bank & Trust
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America N A
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eleos LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]