Hammond v. System Transport, Inc. et al

Defendant: Trans-System, Inc., Robert D Austin and System Transport, Inc.
Plaintiff: Curtis J Hammond, Jr
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv01295
Filed: August 9, 2011
 
Court: Illinois Central District Court
Office: Peoria Office
County: Fulton
Referring Judge: John A. Gorman
Presiding Judge: Joe Billy McDade
 
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2012 34 Featured Case ORDER AND OPINION entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 8/6/2012. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' Motion to Exclude Exhibits Offered in Support of Motion to Dismiss 17 is GRANTED, and Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Counts II, IV, VI, and VIII of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is GRANTED 13 . This matter is referred back to Magistrate Judge John A. Gorman for further pretrial proceedings. IT IS SO ORDERED. (KB, ilcd)
April 26, 2013 62 Featured Case ORDER & OPINION entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 4/26/13: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendants' Motion in Limine 52 is DENIED IN PART and GRANTED IN PART and Defendants' Motion for Protective Order 53 is DENIED IN PART and GRANTE D IN PART. Defendant Austin SHALL appear for a deposition within twenty-eight days of the date of this Order. Evidence of Defendant Austin's observations or actions prior to the vehicle collision WILL NOT be admitted at trial, and Plaintiff SHAL L refrain from asking questions about them during the deposition. Plaintiffs amended response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is DUE twenty-one days after the deposition of Defendant Austin. Defendants' reply to this response is DUE fourteen days after Plaintiff's response is filed. The currently scheduled dates the final pretrial conference and trial are VACATED, to be reset after the pending Motion for Summary Judgment is resolved. SEE WRITTEN ORDER. (AEM, ilcd)
June 20, 2013 65 Featured Case ORDER & OPINION entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 6/20/13. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment as to Counts IX and X of Plaintiff's Complaint 49 is GRANTED. Counts IX and X are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. This matter is SET for a telephone status conference on July 22, 2013, at 1:30 pm, at which the Court will set the dates for final pretrial conference and trial. The Court will place the call to the lead attorneys of record. SEE WRITTEN ORDER. (AEM, ilcd)
September 12, 2013 83 Featured Case ORDER & OPINION entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 9/12/13. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's First Motion in Limine 72 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, Plaintiff's Second Motion in Limine 73 is GRANTED, Plaintiff's Third Motion in Limine 74 is DENIED, and Defendants' Fourth Motion in Limine 81 is DENIED. SEE FULL ORDER. (FDT, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hammond v. System Transport, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans-System, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert D Austin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: System Transport, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis J Hammond, Jr
Represented By: Edmund J Scanlan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]