H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co. v. Crawford

Plaintiff: H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.
Defendant: Dennis Crawford
Case Number: 3:2011cv03448
Filed: December 24, 2011
Court: Illinois Central District Court
Office: Springfield Office
County: Sangamon
Referring Judge: Byron G. Cudmore
Presiding Judge: Sue E. Myerscough
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 12:1819
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION by U.S. Magistrate Judge Byron Cudmore: Plaintiff H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.,'s Motion to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defenses 1-4 Pursuant to Rule 12(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 7 is ALLOWED in part and DENIED in part. See written order. (LB, ilcd)
March 19, 2013 71 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION (See Written Opinion): The Court does NOT dismiss Crawford's breach of contract counterclaim for failure to state a claim. However, the Court RECHARACTERIZES as a counterclaim Crawford's affirmative defense that challenges the amou nt owed to H.D. Smith and will treat the claim as if Crawford raised it as a counterclaim from the beginning of this case. This renders it redundant for Crawford to again challenge the amount he owes H.D. Smith in his counterclaim for breach of cont ract. Therefore, the Court STRIKES Crawford's counterclaim for breach of contract. Crawford need not file another Answer that includes a counterclaim that challenges the amount Crawford owes to H.D. Smith. H.D. Smith shall file all dispositiv e motions that address the newly characterized counterclaim by March 29, 2013. Crawford has until April 8, 2013 to file a response. Further, the Court GRANTS H.D. Smith's Motion to Dismiss Crawford's claim for fraud in Count II of the Counterclaim. Crawford has not sought and therefore will not receive leave to replead his fraud claim. Because Crawford's breach of contract and fraud claims have been disposed of on two separate grounds, the Court need not address H.D. Smith's argument to dismiss Crawford's Counterclaim with prejudice based on Crawford's failure to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 13(a)(1). IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 03/19/2013. (VM, ilcd)
April 29, 2013 73 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION (See Written Opinion): The Court GRANTS summary judgment on Counts I through III of H.D. Smith's First Amended Complaint. Before the Clerk enters final judgment on the amounts Crawford owes for his breach of the duly executed Promissory Notes and Primary Vendor Agreement, H.D. Smith SHALL prepare an accounting to present at a hearing in open court on May 13, 2013 at 3:00 p.m.. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 4/29/2013. (VM, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co. v. Crawford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.
Represented By: Charles Yates Davis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Crawford
Represented By: Ramon Gerardo Rios
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]