Phoenix Bond & Indemnity Co. et al v. Bridge et al

 
Case Number: 1:2005cv04095
Filed: July 15, 2005
 
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
Presiding Judge: James F. Holderman
Referring Judge: Maria Valdez
 
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 5, 2012 1032 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/5/12: For the reasons stated in this Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court denies defendants motions for judgment as a matter of law and for a new trial. The Sass defendants motion to stay was previously ruled upon and is therefore terminated. (mk)
December 7, 2012 1095 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER regarding petitions for attorney's fees and costs, signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/7/2012. The case is set for a status hearing on 12/20/2012 at 9:30 a.m. as more fully described in this decision. (mk)
December 21, 2012 1113 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/21/2012. (mk)
December 23, 2012 1115 Featured Case CORRECTED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/22/12. (mk)
April 29, 2014 1201 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/29/2014: For the reasons stated in the accompanying decision, the Court grants in part Phoenix Bond's and BCS's motions for attorney's fees and costs in [do cket nos. 1185 & 1187]. Counsel are directed to confer promptly to quantify the reductions ordered by the Court and are to make a supplemental joint submission in that regard by no later than May 9, 2014. The attorney time for plaintiffs' coun sel associated with this additional work will not be compensable, unless the Court finds that defendants or their counsel have acted unreasonably or in a dilatory fashion in connection with the additional work required. Status hearing set for 5/15/2014 at 9:30 AM. (mk)
September 1, 2010 658 Featured Case MOTION by Plaintiff Phoenix Bond & Indemnity Co. for judgment MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT (Mathews, Andrew)
September 1, 2010 661 Featured Case MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 9/1/2010.Mailed notice(vcf, )
October 27, 2011 857 Featured Case MOTION by Defendants Kirk Allison, Vinaya Jessani, Movants SASS Muni-IV LLC, SASS Muni-V, LLC for judgment as a Matter of Law, Pursuant to Rule 50(a), in Favor of the Sass Defendants (Warden, Tedd)
October 27, 2011 859 Featured Case MOTION by Defendants Timothy E. Gray, Wheeler-Dealer, Ltd. for judgment as a Matter of Law (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Huyck, William)
October 27, 2011 860 Featured Case MOTION by Defendants Arlene Atlas, Joshua Atlas, Judith Berger, HBZ, Inc., Lori Levinson for judgment as a Matter of Law (with Salta Defendants) (Papadopoulos, Athanasios)
October 30, 2011 867 Featured Case MOTION by Defendants Kirk Allison, Vinaya Jessani, Movants SASS Muni-IV LLC, SASS Muni-V, LLC for judgment The Sass Defendants' Renewed and Supplemental Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Warden, Tedd)
October 31, 2011 869 Featured Case MOTION by Defendants Arlene Atlas, Joshua Atlas, Judith Berger, HBZ, Inc., Lori Levinson, Sabre Group LLC, Movant Marshall Atlas for judgment The Salta and HBZ Defendants' Renewed Joint Motion For Judgment as a Matter of Law (Papadopoulos, Athanasios)
October 31, 2011 871 Featured Case MOTION by Defendants Timothy E. Gray, Wheeler-Dealer, Ltd. for judgment Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Huyck, William)
November 29, 2011 900 Featured Case WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 11/29/2011: For the reasons stated below, the Court denies defendants Wheeler-Dealer, Ltd. and Timothy Grays motion and renewed motion for judgment as a matter of law [docket nos. 859 & 871]. Counsel for both sides should still appear for the December 8, 2011 ruling date and should be prepared to set a prompt date for retrial at that time. Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 11/29/2011. Mailed notice(vcf, )
December 13, 2011 912 Featured Case MOTION by Defendants Kirk Allison, Vinaya Jessani, MD Sass Investors Services, Inc., MD Sass Municipal Finance Partners-IV, LLC, MD Sass Municipal Finance Partners-V, LLC, MD Sass Tax Lien Management, LLC, Movants SASS Muni-IV LLC, SASS Muni-V, LLC for judgment [Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law or, Alternatively, For a New Trial (Rotert, Mark)
January 2, 2012 921 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 1/2/2012. (mk)
January 9, 2012 922 Featured Case MOTION by Plaintiffs BCS Services, Inc., Phoenix Bond & Indemnity Co. for judgment [Joint Submission Regarding Setoff and Entry of Judgment] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit s to Joint Submission)(Stein, Max)
January 24, 2012 939 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 1/24/12. (mk)
January 31, 2012 953 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 1/31/12. (mk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Phoenix Bond & Indemnity Co. et al v. Bridge et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]