Chicago Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Inc. v. Craigslist, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff Chicago Lawyers\' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Inc. alleged that defendant Craigslist, Inc. published notices, statements or advertisements that indicate (1) a preference, limitation or discrimination on the basis of race, color, religion, sex, familial status or national origin, and (2) an intention to make a preference, limitation, or discrimination on the basis of race, color, religion, sex, familial status, or national origin.

Additional Resources

Plaintiff: Chicago Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Inc.
Defendant: Craigslist, Inc.
Amicus: Amazon.Com, Inc., AOL LLC, eBay Inc., Electronic Frontier Foundation, Google Inc., Internet Commerce Coalition, NetChoice, NetCoalition, United States Internet Service Provider Association and Yahoo! Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2006cv00657
Filed: February 3, 2006
 
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Amy J. St. Eve
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 24, 2006 10
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Craigslist, Inc. by Christopher B. Wilson (Wilson, Christopher)
March 14, 2006 11
STATUS Report (Joint Initial Status Report) by Chicago Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Inc., Craigslist, Inc. (Brandfonbrener, Eric)
March 20, 2006 12
MINUTE entry before Judge Amy J. St. Eve : Status hearing held on 3/20/2006. Defendant to answer or otherwise plead by 4/14/2006, limited to 20 pages. Response due by 5/19/2006, limited to 20 pages. Reply due by 6/7/2006. Status hearing set for 7/18/2006 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (tmh, )
April 14, 2006 13
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand With Affirmative Defenses by Craigslist, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Answer (part 2))(Brandfonbrener, Eric)
April 14, 2006 14
MOTION by Defendant Craigslist, Inc. for judgment on the pleadings (Brandfonbrener, Eric)
April 14, 2006 15
MEMORANDUM by Craigslist, Inc. in Support of motion for judgment on the pleadings14 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (unpublished cases))(Brandfonbrener, Eric)
May 19, 2006 16
MEMORANDUM by Chicago Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Inc. in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits)(Libowsky, Stephen)
May 22, 2006 17
MOTION by Plaintiff Chicago Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Inc. for leave to file Amicus Brief (Attachments: # 1 Brief of Amicus Curiae NFHA in Support of Plaintiff)(Libowsky, Stephen)
May 22, 2006 18
NOTICE of Motion by Stephen David Libowsky for presentment of motion for leave to file17 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 5/25/2006 at 09:00 AM. (Libowsky, Stephen)
May 24, 2006 19
MINUTE entry before Judge Amy J. St. Eve : Notice of motion hearing set for 5/25/2006 is stricken and reset to 5/30/3006 at 9:00 A.M. Mailed notice (tmh, )
February 3, 2006 1
COMPLAINT filed by Chicago Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law ; Jury Demand.(hp, )
May 26, 2006 20
RESPONSE by Defendant Craigslist, Inc. to motion for leave to file17 amicus brief (Brandfonbrener, Eric)
May 30, 2006 21
MINUTE entry before Judge Amy J. St. Eve : Defendant's oral motion for an extension of time to file their reply brief in support of the MOTION by Defendant Craigslist, Inc. for judgment on the pleadings 14 is granted. Reply due 6/21/2006. MOTION by Plaintiff Chicago Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Inc. for leave to file Amicus Brief 17 is granted. Defendant's reply to the Amicus brief is due by 6/21/2006. Status hearing set for 7/18/2006 is stricken and reset to 8/22/2006 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (tmh, )
May 30, 2006 22
BRIEF OF AMICUS CURIAE National Fair Housing Alliance in support of plaintiff as to Chicago Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Inc. (Exhibits) (hp, )
June 21, 2006 23
ATTORNEY Appearance for amicus parties by Samuel Fifer (Fifer, Samuel) Modified on 6/22/2006 (rbf, ).
June 21, 2006 24
MOTION by Amicus Parties Amazon.Com, Inc., AOL LLC, eBay Inc., Electronic Frontier Foundation, Google Inc., Internet Commerce Coalition, NetChoice, NetCoalition, United States Internet Service Provider Association, Yahoo! Inc. for leave to file Amicus Brief (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amicus Brief# 2 Exhibit Unpublished Opinions)(Fifer, Samuel)
June 21, 2006 25
NOTICE of Motion by Samuel Fifer for presentment of motion for leave to file, 24 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/27/2006 at 09:00 AM. (Fifer, Samuel)
June 21, 2006 26
ATTORNEY Appearance for Amicus Parties Amazon.Com, Inc., AOL LLC, eBay Inc., Electronic Frontier Foundation, Google Inc., Internet Commerce Coalition, NetChoice, NetCoalition, United States Internet Service Provider Association, Yahoo! Inc. by Julie P. Samuels (Samuels, Julie)
June 21, 2006 27
REPLY by Defendant Craigslist, Inc. to motion for judgment on the pleadings14 In Further Support Of Its Motion For Judgment On The Pleadings (Brandfonbrener, Eric)
June 22, 2006 28
MOTION by Amicus Parties Amazon.Com, Inc., AOL LLC, eBay Inc., Electronic Frontier Foundation, Google Inc., Internet Commerce Coalition, NetChoice, NetCoalition, United States Internet Service Provider Association, Yahoo! Inc. for leave to file Amicus Brief (Amended Motion) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amicus Brief# 2 Exhibit Unpublished Opinions)(Fifer, Samuel)
June 22, 2006 29
RE- NOTICE of Motion by Samuel Fifer for presentment of motion for leave to file, 28 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/27/2006 at 09:00 AM. (Fifer, Samuel)
February 3, 2006 2
CIVIL Cover Sheet (hp, )
June 22, 2006 30
MINUTE entry before Judge Amy J. St. Eve : MOTION by Amicus Parties Amazon.Com, Inc., AOL LLC, eBay Inc., Electronic Frontier Foundation, Google Inc., Internet Commerce Coalition, NetChoice, NetCoalition, United States Internet Service Provider Association, Yahoo! Inc. for leave to file Amicus Brief 24 is granted Mailed notice (tmh, )
June 26, 2006 31
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Chicago Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Inc. by Louis Albert Crisostomo (Crisostomo, Louis)
June 22, 2006 32
BRIEF by Amici Amazon.Com, Inc., AOL LLC, eBay Inc., Google, Inc., Yahoo!Inc., Electronic Frontier Foundation, Internet Commerce Coalition, Netchoice, Netcoalition, and United States Internet Service Provider Association in Support of Craigslist's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings 14 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Unpublished Opinions)(hp, )
June 27, 2006 33
MINUTE entry before Judge Amy J. St. Eve : MOTION by Amicus Parties Amazon.Com, Inc., AOL LLC, eBay Inc., Electronic Frontier Foundation, Google Inc., Internet Commerce Coalition, NetChoice, NetCoalition, United States Internet Service Provider Association, Yahoo! Inc. for leave to file Amicus Brief (Amended Motion) 28 is granted. MOTION by Amicus Parties Amazon.Com, Inc., AOL LLC, eBay Inc., Electronic Frontier Foundation, Google Inc., Internet Commerce Coalition, NetChoice, NetCoalition, United States Internet Service Provider Association, Yahoo! Inc. for leave to file Amicus Brief 24 is denied as moot in light of the filing of the Amended Motion 28. Mailed notice (tmh, )
June 29, 2006 34
MOTION by Plaintiff Chicago Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Inc. for judgment on the pleadings to file a surreply brief in opposition to Craigslist's motion (Libowsky, Stephen)
June 29, 2006 35
NOTICE of Motion by Stephen David Libowsky for presentment of motion for judgment on the pleadings34 before Honorable Jeffrey Cole on 6/6/2006 at 09:00 AM. (Libowsky, Stephen)
June 29, 2006 36
SUR-REPLY by Plaintiff Chicago Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Inc. in opposition to Craiglist's motion for judgment on the pleadings (Libowsky, Stephen)
June 30, 2006 37
NOTICE of Motion by Stephen David Libowsky for presentment of motion for judgment on the pleadings34 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 7/6/2006 at 09:00 AM. (Libowsky, Stephen)
July 3, 2006 38
REPLY by Defendant Craigslist, Inc. to motion for judgment on the pleadings34 (reply to motion for leave to file surreply) (Brandfonbrener, Eric)
July 5, 2006 39
MINUTE entry before Judge Amy J. St. Eve : MOTION by Plaintiff Chicago Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Inc. for judgment on the pleadings to file a surreply brief in opposition to Craigslist's motion 34 is granted. In considering the motion, the Court will address Craigslist's argument regarding exhibits. Mailed notice (tmh, )
February 3, 2006 3
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Chicago Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law by Stephen David Libowsky (hp, )
August 11, 2006 40
MINUTE entry before Judge Amy J. St. Eve : Status hearing set for 8/22/2006 is stricken and reset to 10/3/2006 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (tmh, )
September 29, 2006 41
MOTION by Plaintiff Chicago Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Inc. for leave to file New Supplemental Authority From the United States Department of Housing and Urban Development (Libowsky, Stephen)
September 29, 2006 42
NOTICE of Motion by Stephen David Libowsky for presentment of motion for leave to file41 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 10/4/2006 at 09:00 AM. (Libowsky, Stephen)
October 2, 2006 43
MINUTE entry before Judge Amy J. St. Eve : MOTION by Plaintiff Chicago Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Inc. for leave to file New Supplemental Authority From the United States Department of Housing and Urban Development 41 is granted. Response due by 10/4/2006. Status hearing set for 10/3/2006 is stricken and reset to 10/11/2006 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (tmh, )
October 4, 2006 44
MEMORANDUM by Craigslist, Inc. in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion To File Supplemental Authority (Brandfonbrener, Eric)
October 6, 2006 45
MINUTE entry before Judge Amy J. St. Eve : Status hearing set for 10/11/2006 is stricken and reset to 10/30/2006 at 08:45 AM. Mailed notice (tmh, )
October 24, 2006 46
MINUTE entry before Judge Amy J. St. Eve : Status hearing set for 10/30/2006 is stricken and reset to 11/13/2006 at 08:45 AM. Mailed notice (tmh, )
November 9, 2006 47
MINUTE entry before Judge Amy J. St. Eve : Status hearing set for 11/13/2006 is stricken and reset to 11/21/2006 at 08:45 AM. Mailed notice (tmh, )
November 9, 2006 48
MINUTE entry before Judge Amy J. St. Eve : Status hearing set for 11/21/2006 is stricken and reset to 11/22/2006 at 08:45 AM. Mailed notice (tmh, )
November 14, 2006 49
MINUTE entry before Judge Amy J. St. Eve : MOTION by Defendant Craigslist, Inc. for judgment on the pleadings 14 is granted. Status hearing set for 11/22/2006 is stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (tmh, )
February 3, 2006 4
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Chicago Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law by Laurie Arden Wardell (hp, )
November 14, 2006 50 Opinion or Order of the Court
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by Judge Amy J. St. Eve on 11/14/2006:Mailed notice(tmh, )
November 14, 2006 51
ENTERED JUDGMENT on 11/14/2006:Mailed notice(tmh, )
November 17, 2006 52
MOTION by Plaintiff Chicago Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Inc. to alter judgment Or Amend Judgment, MOTION by Plaintiff Chicago Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Inc. to amend/correct (Libowsky, Stephen)
November 17, 2006 53
NOTICE of Motion by Stephen David Libowsky for presentment of motion to alter judgment, motion to amend/correct52 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 11/22/2006 at 08:45 AM. (Libowsky, Stephen)
November 22, 2006 54
MINUTE entry before Judge Amy J. St. Eve : MOTION by Plaintiff Chicago Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Inc. to alter judgment Or Amend Judgment, MOTION by Plaintiff Chicago Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Inc. to amend/correct 52 is entered. Set deadlines/hearing as to motion to alter judgment, motion to amend/correct52 : Responses due by 12/1/2006, no more than 10 pages. Replies due by 12/8/2006, no more than 10 pages. Ruling will be by mail. Mailed notice (tmh, )
December 1, 2006 55
MEMORANDUM by Craigslist, Inc. in Opposition to Plaintiff CLC's Motion to Alter Or Amend Judgment (Brandfonbrener, Eric)
December 8, 2006 56
REPLY Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment Pursuant to Rule 59(e) (Libowsky, Stephen)
December 8, 2006 57
NOTICE by Chicago Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Inc. of Filing of Reply Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment (Libowsky, Stephen)
December 15, 2006 58
MINUTE entry before Judge Amy J. St. Eve : Minute entry dated 11/22/2006 54 is amended as follows:MOTION by Plaintiff Chicago Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Inc. to alter judgment Or Amend Judgment, MOTION by Plaintiff Chicago Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Inc. to amend/correct 52 is entered in part and denied in part. Response as to the print issue due by 12/1/2006, with no more than ten pages. Reply due by 12/8/2006, with no more than ten pages. Ruling will be by mail. Mailed notice (tmh, )
December 19, 2006 59
MOTION by Defendant Craigslist, Inc. to file instanter sur-reply in further opposition to CLC's motion to alter or amend judgment (Brandfonbrener, Eric)
February 3, 2006 5
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Chicago Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Inc. by Elyssa Balingit Winslow (hp, )
December 19, 2006 60
NOTICE of Motion by Eric D. Brandfonbrener for presentment of motion to file instanter59 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 12/22/2006 at 09:00 AM. (Brandfonbrener, Eric)
December 21, 2006 61
MINUTE entry before Judge Amy J. St. Eve :MOTION by Defendant Craigslist, Inc. to file instanter sur-reply in further opposition to CLC's motion to alter or amend judgment 59 is grantedMailed notice (tmh, )
December 22, 2006 62
SUR-REPLY by Defendant Craigslist, Inc. to motion to alter judgment, motion to amend/correct52 (Brandfonbrener, Eric)
December 22, 2006 63
MOTION by Plaintiff Chicago Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Inc. for leave to file a Supplemental Reply Memorandum In Support of Its Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment Pursuant to Rule 59(e) (Libowsky, Stephen)
December 22, 2006 64
NOTICE of Motion by Stephen David Libowsky for presentment of motion for leave to file63 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 12/28/2006 at 08:45 AM. (Libowsky, Stephen)
December 22, 2006 65
REPLY by Plaintiff Chicago Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Inc. to motion for leave to file63 (Supplemental Reply Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment Pursuant to Rule 59(e)) (Libowsky, Stephen)
December 26, 2006 66
MINUTE entry before Judge Amy J. St. Eve :MOTION by Plaintiff Chicago Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Inc. for leave to file a Supplemental Reply Memorandum In Support of Its Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment Pursuant to Rule 59(e) 63 is denied. No further briefing unless ordered by the court.Mailed notice (tmh, )
January 10, 2007 67
MINUTE entry before Judge Amy J. St. Eve :MOTION by Plaintiff Chicago Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Inc. to amend/correct 52 is denied.Mailed notice (tmh, )
January 11, 2007 68
NOTICE of appeal by Chicago Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Inc. regarding orders 51, 49, 50, 67 ; Filing fee $ 455.00 paid; Receipt number 10645870 (dj, )
January 11, 2007 69
DOCKETING Statement by Chicago Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Inc. regarding notice of appeal68 (dj, )
January 12, 2007 70
TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on 1/12/07 notice of appeal68. Notified counsel (dj, )
January 16, 2007 71
SEVENTH CIRCUIT transcript information sheet by Chicago Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Inc. (hp, )
January 16, 2007 72
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal 68 ; USCA Case No. 07-1101 (hp, )
January 29, 2007 73
TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit the long record on appeal 68 (USCA no. 07-1101) consisting of 2 volumes of pleadings. (dj, )
January 29, 2007 74
USCA RECEIVED on 1/29/07 the long record on appeal (07-1101) (dj, )
February 3, 2006 7
SUMMONS Issued one original and one copy as to Defendant Craigslist, Inc. (hp, )
February 10, 2006 8
MINUTE entry before Judge Amy J. St. Eve : Joint Status Report due by 3/15/2006. Initial Status hearing set for 3/20/2006 at 09:00 AM. in Courtroom 1241. Mailed notice (tmh, )
February 24, 2006 9
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Craigslist, Inc. by Eric D. Brandfonbrener (Brandfonbrener, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Chicago Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Inc. v. Craigslist, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chicago Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Inc.
Represented By: Elyssa Balingit Winslow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craigslist, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher B. Wilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Amazon.Com, Inc.
Represented By: Julie P. Samuels
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: AOL LLC
Represented By: Julie P. Samuels
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: eBay Inc.
Represented By: Julie P. Samuels
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Electronic Frontier Foundation
Represented By: Julie P. Samuels
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Google Inc.
Represented By: Julie P. Samuels
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Internet Commerce Coalition
Represented By: Julie P. Samuels
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: NetChoice
Represented By: Julie P. Samuels
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: NetCoalition
Represented By: Julie P. Samuels
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: United States Internet Service Provider Association
Represented By: Julie P. Samuels
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Yahoo! Inc.
Represented By: Julie P. Samuels
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]