Vance v. Rumsfeld

Case Number: 1:2006cv06964
Filed: December 18, 2006
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
Presiding Judge: Wayne R. Andersen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 29, 2009 164 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Wayne R. Andersen on 7/29/2009.(tsa, )
March 5, 2010 214 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Wayne R. Andersen on 3/5/2010.(tsa, )
May 26, 2010 261 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Wayne R. Andersen on 5/26/2010.(tsa, )
July 15, 2013 308 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Defendants Donald Rumsfeld, United States of America for judgment (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitman, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vance v. Rumsfeld
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]