Bank of America, N.A, Successor to LaSalle Bank, National Association, a national banking association v. First Mutual Bancorp of Illinois, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A, Successor to LaSalle Bank, National Association, a national banking association
Defendant: First Mutual Bancorp of Illinois, Inc. and Pethinaidu Veluchamy
 
Case Number: 1:2009cv05108
Filed: August 19, 2009
 
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: David H. Coar
Referring Judge:
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Negotiable Instrument
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 26, 2010 127 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable David H. Coar on 4/26/2010.(kj, )
June 14, 2010 150 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown on 6/14/2010.Mailed notice(lxs, )
July 1, 2010 154 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable David H. Coar on 7/1/2010.(kj, )
July 22, 2010 166 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Geraldine Soat Brown on 7/22/2010:Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
December 29, 2010 220 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable David H. Coar on 12/29/2010.Mailed notice(pm, )
February 1, 2011 254 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 2/1/2011:Mailed notice(srn, )
February 23, 2011 311 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 2/23/2011:Mailed notice(srn, )
April 14, 2011 415 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 4/14/2011:Mailed notice(srn, )
July 12, 2011 505 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 7/12/2011:Mailed notice(srn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A, Successor to LaSalle Bank, National Association, a national banking association v. First Mutual Bancorp of Illinois, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A, Successor to LaSalle Bank, National Association, a national banking association
Represented By: Travis D Rojakovick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Mutual Bancorp of Illinois, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pethinaidu Veluchamy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]