Montanez v. Fico (Star #6284) et al

Plaintiff: Andy Montanez
Defendant: Chicago Police Offi Fico (Star #6284), Chicago Police Offi Simon (Star #16497) and City of Chicago
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv04708
Filed: July 28, 2010
 
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: John A. Nordberg
 
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 11, 2012 101 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered before Honorable Sheila Finnegan on 6/11/2012: Plaintiff's motions in limine 55 56 57 58 59 60 61 62 63 64 65 66 67 68 69 70 72 73 74 75 and Defendants' motions in limine 71 are ruled upon as stated previously in open court. The Statement portion of this Minute Order sets forth a summary of those rulings. [For further detials see minute order.] Notices mailed by Judicial staff. (is, )
March 18, 2013 164 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Sheila Finnegan on 3/18/2013: Mailed notice. (is, )
June 6, 2012 95 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entry before Honorable Sheila Finnegan on 6/6/2012: Plaintiff's Motion in Limine to Bar Argument or Evidence of Expert Opinions from Plaintiff's Treating Personnel 78 is denied. [For further details see minute order.] Notices mailed by Judicial staff. (is, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Montanez v. Fico (Star #6284) et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy Montanez
Represented By: Barbara C. Long
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Police Offi Fico (Star #6284)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Police Offi Simon (Star #16497)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Chicago
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]