JSB Law PC et al v. Lamberto et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: JSB Law PC, Judith Bethge and Roy Bethge
Defendant: John Lamberto, West Publishing Corporation, West Publishing Corporation dba FindLaw, FindLaw, Thomson Reuters Applications, Inc., Thomson Legal & Regulatory Applications, Inc., West Services, Inc., Thomson Reuters (Legal) Inc., West Publishing Corporation dba Thomson/West, Thomson/West, Thomson Corporation and Thomson Reuters Corporation
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv06316
Filed: October 1, 2010
 
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: McHenry
Presiding Judge: John F. Grady
 
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 18, 2011 25 MINUTE entry before Honorable John F. Grady: Plaintiffs filed a Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice and without an award of fees or costs to any party 24 on 5/12/2011. Accordingly, this case is dismissed with prejudice. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (cdh, )
May 12, 2011 24 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing)(Mudd, Charles)
May 12, 2011 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Judith Bethge, Roy Bethge, JSB Law PC by Charles Lee Mudd, Jr (Mudd, Charles)
March 16, 2011 22 MINUTE entry before Honorable John F. Grady:Status hearing held and continued to July 6, 2011 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (cdh, )
January 25, 2011 21 MINUTE entry before Honorable John F. Grady:Status hearing set for 2/16/2011 is canceled and reset to 3/16/2011 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (cdh, )
January 25, 2011 20 MINUTE entry before Honorable John F. Grady: The parties' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time (18) is granted. Defendant John Lamberto may file a motion to dismiss plaintiffs' amended complaint by February 2, 2011. Plaintiffs shall respond by March 3, 2011 to (1) Lamberto's motion to dismiss and (2) defendant West Publishing Corporation's motion to dismiss. Lamberto and West Publishing Corporation shall reply by March 17, 2011. The motion hearing scheduled for January 26, 2011 is stricken. Mailed notice (cdh, )
January 17, 2011 19 NOTICE of Motion by Justin David Kaplan for presentment of extension of time 18 before Honorable John F. Grady on 1/26/2011 at 10:30 AM. (Kaplan, Justin)
January 17, 2011 18 MOTION by Defendant John Lamberto for extension of time (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Justin)
December 29, 2010 17 MINUTE entry before Honorable John F. Grady:Motion hearing held. West's motion to dismiss 12 is entered and continued. Status hearing set for 2/16/2011 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed (vmj, )
December 28, 2010 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant John Lamberto by Justin David Kaplan (Kaplan, Justin)
December 28, 2010 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant John Lamberto by Daniel Francis Lynch (Lynch, Daniel)
December 23, 2010 14 NOTICE of Motion by Peter Andrew Steinmeyer for presentment of motion to dismiss 12 before Honorable John F. Grady on 12/29/2010 at 10:30 AM. (Steinmeyer, Peter)
December 23, 2010 13 MEMORANDUM by West Publishing Corporation in support of motion to dismiss 12 (Steinmeyer, Peter)
December 23, 2010 12 MOTION by Defendant West Publishing Corporation to dismiss (Steinmeyer, Peter)
December 23, 2010 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant West Publishing Corporation by Christie O Tate (Tate, Christie)
December 23, 2010 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant West Publishing Corporation by Peter Andrew Steinmeyer (Steinmeyer, Peter)
December 21, 2010 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiffs Judith Bethge, Roy Bethge, JSB Law PC regarding Amended Complaint, Summons and Corrected Notice of Filing served on John Lamberto on 12/13/2010 (Petrolis, Mark)
December 10, 2010 8 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant John Lamberto (hp, )
December 10, 2010 7 NOTICE by Judith Bethge, Roy Bethge, JSB Law PC re amended complaint 6 Corrected Notice of Filing (Petrolis, Mark)
December 10, 2010 6 AMENDED complaint by Roy Bethge, Judith Bethge, JSB Law PC against John Lamberto, West Publishing Corporation dba FindLaw (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Notice of Filing)(Petrolis, Mark)
November 23, 2010 5 MINUTE entry before Honorable John F. Grady: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Certain defendants without prejudice was filed on 11/19/10 14 by plaintiffs'. Accordingly, the following defendants are dismissed: West Publishing Corporation, FindLaw, Thomson Reuters Applications, Inc., Thomson Legal & Regulatory Applications, Inc., West Services Inc., Thomson Reuters (Legal) Inc., West Publishing Corporation dba Thomson/West, Thomson West, Thomson Corporation, and Thomson Reuters Corporation. Mailed (vmj, )
November 19, 2010 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Judith Bethge, Roy Bethge, JSB Law PC Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Certain Defendants Without Prejudice (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing)(Petrolis, Mark)
October 1, 2010 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John F. Grady. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. (jn, )
October 1, 2010 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Judith Bethge, Roy Bethge, JSB Law PC by Mark Anthony Petrolis (Petrolis, Mark)
October 1, 2010 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Petrolis, Mark)
October 1, 2010 1 COMPLAINT filed by Roy Bethge, Judith Bethge, JSB Law PC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-5278127.(Petrolis, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: JSB Law PC et al v. Lamberto et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JSB Law PC
Represented By: Mark Anthony Petrolis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Bethge
Represented By: Mark Anthony Petrolis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Bethge
Represented By: Mark Anthony Petrolis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Lamberto
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Publishing Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Publishing Corporation dba FindLaw
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FindLaw
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomson Reuters Applications, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomson Legal & Regulatory Applications, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Services, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomson Reuters (Legal) Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Publishing Corporation dba Thomson/West
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomson/West
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomson Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomson Reuters Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]