Groupon, Inc. v. MobGob, LLC Featured Case

Plaintiff Groupon, Inc. alleged that Defendant MobGob, LLC had created a system for aggregating demand for the purchase of a product by a number of individual buyers, which infringed on U.S. Patent No. 6,269,343 entitled "On-Line Marketing System and Method."

Plaintiff: Groupon, Inc.
Defendant: MobGob, LLC
Case Number: 1:2010cv07456
Filed: November 18, 2010
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 20, 2012 56 MAILED patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (Attachments: # 1 Minute Order).(smm)
January 20, 2012 55 MINUTE entry before Honorable William J. Hibbler: This case is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice and without costs, expenses and attorneys' fees pursuant to the stipulation. All pending dates and motions are terminated as moot. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (jdh)
January 19, 2012 54 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Davis, Kyle)
January 10, 2012 53 MINUTE entry before Honorable William J. Hibbler: Status hearing reset to 2/23/2012 at 9:30 AM for report on settlement. Parties to advise the Court if the matter is resolved prior to the next court date. Mailed notice (jdh)
December 8, 2011 52 MINUTE entry before Honorable William J. Hibbler: Defendant fails to appear.Status hearing held and continued to 1/10/2012 at 09:30 AM for a report on status of settlement documents.Mailed notice (jms, )
November 8, 2011 51 MINUTE entry before Honorable William J. Hibbler: Status hearing held on 11/8/2011 and continued to 12/8/2011 at 9:30 AM for report on settlement. Parties to advise the Court if the matter is resolved prior to the next court date. Mailed notice (jdh)
October 11, 2011 50 MINUTE entry before Honorable William J. Hibbler: Status hearing held on 10/11/2011 and continued to 11/8/2011 at 9:30 AM. The entry of the scheduling order is held in abeyance. Mailed notice (jdh)
September 8, 2011 49 MINUTE entry before Honorable William J. Hibbler: Status hearing held on 9/8/2011 and continued to 10/11/2011 at 9:30 A.M. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
June 29, 2011 48 MINUTE entry before Honorable William J. Hibbler: Status hearing held on 6/29/2011 and continued to 9/8/2011 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice (jdh)
June 21, 2011 47 ANSWER to counterclaim as amended 6/8/2011 by Groupon, Inc. (Davis, Kyle)
June 8, 2011 46 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by MobGob, LLC(Williams, David)
May 25, 2011 45 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable William J. Hibbler on 5/25/2011: Mailed notice(hp, )
May 25, 2011 44 MINUTE entry before Honorable William J. Hibbler: Enter Memorandum Opinion and Order. The Court Denies Defendant/Counter-Claimant's Motion to Dismiss 25 . The Court Grants Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant's motions to strike 28 and to dismiss 31 without prejudice to Defendant/Counter-Claimant amending its pleadings in accordance with the Court's opinion. The Court gives Defendant/Counter-Claimant until 6/9/2011 to amend its pleadings and to answer or otherwise plead in response to the complaint 25 . The Court gives Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant until June 23 to answer or otherwise plead in response to Defendant/Counter-Claimant's amended pleadings. Status hearing set for 6/29/2011 at 9:30 a.m Mailed notice (hp, )
May 25, 2011 43 MINUTE entry before Honorable William J. Hibbler: Status hearing stricken. Detailed signature order to follow. In court notice (jdh)
April 14, 2011 42 REPLY by Groupon, Inc. to response in opposition to motion 37 , MOTION by Counter Defendant Groupon, Inc. to dismiss SECOND COUNTERCLAIM 31 (Zeller, Steven)
April 14, 2011 41 REPLY by Groupon, Inc. to response in opposition to motion 36 , MOTION by Plaintiff Groupon, Inc. to strike answer to complaint, counterclaim 24 28 (Zeller, Steven)
March 23, 2011 40 REPLY by MobGob, LLC to MOTION by Defendant MobGob, LLC to dismiss Groupon, Inc.s Claims of Induced Infringement, Contributor Infringement, and Willful Infringement 25 , response in opposition to motion 38 (Giza, Alexander)
March 9, 2011 38 RESPONSE by Groupon, Inc. in Opposition to MOTION by Defendant MobGob, LLC to dismiss Groupon, Inc.s Claims of Induced Infringement, Contributor Infringement, and Willful Infringement 25 (Zeller, Steven)
March 9, 2011 37 RESPONSE by MobGob, LLCin Opposition to MOTION by Counter Defendant Groupon, Inc. to dismiss SECOND COUNTERCLAIM 31 (Giza, Alexander)
March 9, 2011 36 RESPONSE by MobGob, LLCin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Groupon, Inc. to strike answer to complaint, counterclaim 24 28 (Giza, Alexander)
March 3, 2011 39 MINUTE entry before Honorable William J. Hibbler: Motion hearing held on 3/3/2011 regarding motion to strike, motion for relief, 28 , motion to dismiss 31 . Plaintiff's Motion to strike 28 and Motion to dismiss defendant's second counterclaim 31 are taken under advisement. Defendant to respond by 3/31/2011. Plaintiff to reply by 4/14/2011. Ruling by mail. Status hearing reset to 5/25/2011 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice (jdh)
February 23, 2011 33 NOTICE of Motion by Kyle Alexander Davis for presentment of motion to dismiss 31 before Honorable William J. Hibbler on 3/3/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Davis, Kyle)
February 23, 2011 32 MEMORANDUM by Groupon, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss 31 SECOND COUNTERCLAIM (Davis, Kyle)
February 23, 2011 31 MOTION by Counter Defendant Groupon, Inc. to dismiss SECOND COUNTERCLAIM (Davis, Kyle)
February 23, 2011 30 NOTICE of Motion by Kyle Alexander Davis for presentment of motion to strike, motion for relief, 28 before Honorable William J. Hibbler on 3/3/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Davis, Kyle)
February 23, 2011 29 MEMORANDUM by Groupon, Inc. in support of motion to strike, motion for relief, 28 (Davis, Kyle)
February 23, 2011 28 MOTION by Plaintiff Groupon, Inc. to strike answer to complaint, counterclaim 24 (Davis, Kyle)
February 23, 2011 27 ANSWER to counterclaim by Groupon, Inc. (Davis, Kyle)
February 16, 2011 35 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER 34 Signed by the Honorable William J. Hibbler on 2/16/2011: Mailed notice(hp, )
February 16, 2011 34 MINUTE entry before Honorable William J. Hibbler: Status hearing held and continued to 5/3/2011 at 9:30 a.m. The Court adopts the joint proposed scheduling order. Enter Scheduling Order. Defendant's Motion to dismiss Groupon, Inc.'s claims of induced infringement, contributor infringement and willful infringement # 25 is taken under advisement. Plaintiff to respond by 3/9/2011. Defendant to reply by 3/23/2011. Ruling by mail. (For further detail see separate order.) Mailed notice (hp, )
February 2, 2011 26 NOTICE of Motion by Alexander Giza for presentment of before Honorable William J. Hibbler on 2/16/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Giza, Alexander)
February 2, 2011 25 MOTION by Defendant MobGob, LLC to dismiss Groupon, Inc.s Claims of Induced Infringement, Contributor Infringement, and Willful Infringement (Giza, Alexander)
February 2, 2011 24 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM filed by MobGob, LLC against Groupon, Inc.. by MobGob, LLC(Giza, Alexander)
January 10, 2011 23 MINUTE entry before Honorable William J. Hibbler: Agreed Motion to extend time until 2/2/2011 to respond to the complaint 11 is granted. Application to appear pro hac vice of Alexander C.D. Giza 8 and Andres D. Weiss 14 as counsel for defendant are granted. Status hearing to set discovery schedule set for 2/16/2011 at 9:30 AM. Parties to submit joint proposed discovery schedule to the Court by 2/14/2011. Mailed notice (jdh)
January 6, 2011 22 NOTICE of Correction regarding attorney appearance 19 . Document entered in error. (hp, )
January 5, 2011 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant MobGob, LLC by David B. H. Williams (Williams, David)
January 5, 2011 20 AMENDED NOTICE of Motion by David B. H. Williams for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 11 before Honorable William J. Hibbler on 1/11/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Williams, David)
January 5, 2011 19 ENTERED IN ERROR (Williams, David) Modified on 1/6/2011 (hp, ). (Main Document 19 replaced on 1/6/2011) (hp, ).
December 28, 2010 18 AMENDED Notice of Agreed Motion to Extend Time for Defendant MobGob, LLC to Respond to the Complaint (Giza, Alexander)
December 23, 2010 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MobGob, LLC as to MobGob, LLC on 12/13/2010, answer due 1/3/2011. (Zeller, Steven)
December 21, 2010 16 NOTICE by MobGob, LLC of Disclosure Statement (Giza, Alexander)
December 21, 2010 15 PAYMENT by MobGob, LLC of Pro Hac Fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-5541431. (Weiss, Andrew)
December 21, 2010 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrew Weiss for Defendant MobGob, LLC (Weiss, Andrew)
December 20, 2010 13 AMENDED NOTICE of Motion by Alexander Giza for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 11 before Honorable William J. Hibbler on 12/29/2010 at 09:30 AM. (Giza, Alexander)
December 20, 2010 12 PAYMENT by MobGob, LLC of Pro Hac Fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-5537431. (Giza, Alexander)
December 20, 2010 11 MOTION by Defendant MobGob, LLC for extension of time to file answer (Giza, Alexander)
December 20, 2010 10 NOTICE by MobGob, LLC of Agreed Motion to Extend Time to File Answer (Giza, Alexander)
December 20, 2010 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant MobGob, LLC by Alexander Giza (Giza, Alexander)
December 20, 2010 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Giza, Alexander)
November 23, 2010 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant MobGob, LLC. (ef, )
November 19, 2010 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable William J. Hibbler. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. (lcw, )
November 18, 2010 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Groupon, Inc. by Kyle Alexander Davis (Davis, Kyle)
November 18, 2010 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Groupon, Inc. by Steven McMahon Zeller (Zeller, Steven)
November 18, 2010 4 Notice of Claim Involving Patents by Groupon, Inc. (Zeller, Steven)
November 18, 2010 3 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Groupon, Inc. (Zeller, Steven)
November 18, 2010 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Zeller, Steven)
November 18, 2010 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed by Groupon, Inc. ; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-5437160. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit US Patent 6,269,343)(Zeller, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Groupon, Inc. v. MobGob, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Groupon, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle Alexander Davis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MobGob, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]