Grady v. Ocwen Loan Servicing Ctr LLC

Plaintiff: Lauretta Grady
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing Ctr LLC
Case Number: 1:2011cv01531
Filed: March 4, 2011
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Robert M. Dow
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 19, 2012 35 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 3/19/2012. Mailed notice(tbk, )
June 11, 2013 74 Opinion or Order of the Court WRITTEN Opinion entered by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 6/11/2013:For the reasons stated below, Plaintiff's objections 59 to Magistrate Judge Schenkier's March 18 ruling [see 58, 62] are respectfully overruled; the ruling is aff irmed and the following briefing schedule is set for dispositive motions: Plaintiff's response to Defendants' motion for summary judgment 67 and cross-motion for summary judgment, if any, are due on 7/8/2013; Defendants' response/reply brief is due on 7/29/2013; Plaintiffs reply, if any, is due on 8/13/2013. The Court will issue a ruling by mail on the dispositive motion(s). Mailed notice(tbk, )
January 21, 2014 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTER MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons stated below, the Court grants Defendants' partial motion for summary judgment 67 and denies Plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment 75 . The only claim remaining for dispositi on is Plaintiffs claim that OLS charged for excessive valuations. Status hearing set for 1/30/2014 at 09:00 AM. to discuss how to proceed on Plaintiff's remaining claim. Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 1/21/2014. Mailed notice(tbk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grady v. Ocwen Loan Servicing Ctr LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauretta Grady
Represented By: Philip Dale Segrest, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing Ctr LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.