F.B.N. Shipping Solutions, Inc. v. PNC Financial Services Group, Inc., et al

Defendant: PNC Financial Services Group, Inc. and PNC Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: F.B.N. Shipping Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv02932
Filed: May 2, 2011
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Milton I. Shadur
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 16, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 6/16/2011:Mailed notice(srn, )
August 15, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 8/15/2011:Mailed notice(srn, )
September 15, 2011 45 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 9/15/2011:Mailed notice(srn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: F.B.N. Shipping Solutions, Inc. v. PNC Financial Services Group, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Financial Services Group, Inc.
Represented By: Christina Mary Ripley
Represented By: James M. Crowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F.B.N. Shipping Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Allen Maciejewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.