Radogno et al v. IL State Board of Elections et al

Defendant: Ernest C. Gowen, Willilam F. McGuffage, Judith C. Rice, Charles W. Scholz, Jesse R. Smart, Illinois State Board of Elections, Rupert Borgsmiller, Harold D. Byers, Bryan A. Schneider and Betty J. Coffrin
Plaintiff: Elidia Mares, Edwin Tolentino, Christine Radogno, Thomas Cross, Adam Brown, Veronica Vera, Chole Moore, Joe Trevino and Angel Garcia
Intervenor_plaintiff: Illinois Republican Party
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv04884
Filed: July 20, 2011
 
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
0 Judge: Elaine E. Bucklo
1 Judge: Philip P. Simon
2 Judge: Diane S. Sykes
 
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2011 59 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo, Judge Diane S. Sykes and Judge Philip P. Simon on 10/21/2011:Mailed notice(mpj, )
November 22, 2011 84 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by Honorable Judges Elaine E. Bucklo, Diane S. Sykes and Philip P. Simon on 11/22/2011:Mailed notice(mpj, )
December 7, 2011 97 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Judges Elaine E. Bucklo, Diane S. Sykes and Philip P. Simon on 12/7/2011:Mailed notice(mpj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Radogno et al v. IL State Board of Elections et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest C. Gowen
Represented By: David W. Ellis
Represented By: Michael Thomas Layden
Represented By: Richard J. Prendergast
Represented By: Brent Douglas Stratton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willilam F. McGuffage
Represented By: David W. Ellis
Represented By: Michael Thomas Layden
Represented By: Richard J. Prendergast
Represented By: Brent Douglas Stratton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith C. Rice
Represented By: David W. Ellis
Represented By: Michael Thomas Layden
Represented By: Richard J. Prendergast
Represented By: Brent Douglas Stratton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles W. Scholz
Represented By: David W. Ellis
Represented By: Michael Thomas Layden
Represented By: Richard J. Prendergast
Represented By: Brent Douglas Stratton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse R. Smart
Represented By: David W. Ellis
Represented By: Michael Thomas Layden
Represented By: Richard J. Prendergast
Represented By: Brent Douglas Stratton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois State Board of Elections
Represented By: David W. Ellis
Represented By: Michael James Kasper
Represented By: Michael Thomas Layden
Represented By: Richard J. Prendergast
Represented By: Brent Douglas Stratton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rupert Borgsmiller
Represented By: David W. Ellis
Represented By: Michael Thomas Layden
Represented By: Richard J. Prendergast
Represented By: Brent Douglas Stratton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold D. Byers
Represented By: David W. Ellis
Represented By: Michael Thomas Layden
Represented By: Richard J. Prendergast
Represented By: Brent Douglas Stratton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan A. Schneider
Represented By: David W. Ellis
Represented By: Michael Thomas Layden
Represented By: Richard J. Prendergast
Represented By: Brent Douglas Stratton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty J. Coffrin
Represented By: David W. Ellis
Represented By: Michael Thomas Layden
Represented By: Richard J. Prendergast
Represented By: Brent Douglas Stratton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elidia Mares
Represented By: Brian J. Armstrong
Represented By: Phillip Anthony Luetkehans
Represented By: Stephanie Jane Luetkehans
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Tolentino
Represented By: Brian J. Armstrong
Represented By: Phillip Anthony Luetkehans
Represented By: Stephanie Jane Luetkehans
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Radogno
Represented By: Stephanie Jane Luetkehans
Represented By: Phillip Anthony Luetkehans
Represented By: Brian J. Armstrong
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Cross
Represented By: Andrew T. Sperry
Represented By: Phillip Anthony Luetkehans
Represented By: Thomas More Leinenweber
Represented By: Peter Gene Baroni
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Brown
Represented By: Andrew T. Sperry
Represented By: Phillip Anthony Luetkehans
Represented By: Thomas More Leinenweber
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Vera
Represented By: Stephanie Jane Luetkehans
Represented By: Phillip Anthony Luetkehans
Represented By: Brian J. Armstrong
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chole Moore
Represented By: Andrew T. Sperry
Represented By: Phillip Anthony Luetkehans
Represented By: Thomas More Leinenweber
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Trevino
Represented By: Thomas More Leinenweber
Represented By: Phillip Anthony Luetkehans
Represented By: Andrew T. Sperry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Garcia
Represented By: Thomas More Leinenweber
Represented By: Phillip Anthony Luetkehans
Represented By: Andrew T. Sperry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Illinois Republican Party
Represented By: John G. Fogarty
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]