John Wiley & Sons, Ltd. et al

Defendant: John Does 1-10 and McDonell Boehnen Hulbert & Bergoff LLP
Plaintiff: John Wiley & Sons, Ltd. and American Institute of Physics
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv01446
Filed: February 29, 2012
 
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Norgle
 
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 7, 2013 145 Featured Case MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Arlander Keys on 6/7/2013. (ac, )
June 24, 2013 176 Featured Case MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Arlander Keys on 6/24/2013. (ac, )
September 16, 2013 203 Featured Case MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Arlander Keys on 9/16/2013:(ac, )
February 12, 2013 78 Featured Case MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Arlander Keys on 2/12/2013. (ac, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: John Wiley & Sons, Ltd. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDonell Boehnen Hulbert & Bergoff LLP
Represented By: Dale M. Cendali
Represented By: Barry F. Irwin
Represented By: Leif R. Sigmond, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Wiley & Sons, Ltd.
Represented By: Annette Michele McGarry
Represented By: Marianne C. Holzhall
Represented By: William Irvin Dunnegan
Represented By: Laura Jean Scileppi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Institute of Physics
Represented By: William Irvin Dunnegan
Represented By: Marianne C. Holzhall
Represented By: Annette Michele McGarry
Represented By: Laura Jean Scileppi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]