Toma v. Motley Crue, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Ron Toma
Defendant: Motley Crue, Inc., 11-7 Recording Corp., 10th Street Entertainment Associates, LLC and Live Nation Merchandise, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv02796
Filed: April 16, 2012
 
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Du Page
Presiding Judge: Matthew F. Kennelly
 
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
October 16, 2012 26 MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (Attachments: # 1 Minute Order) (ao,)
October 15, 2012 25 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Case is dismissed pursuant to stipulations by the parties. Status hearing set for 10/15/2012 is vacated. Civil case terminated. (or, )
October 15, 2012 24 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ron Toma of All Remaining Defendants (Thompson, Lawrence)
October 5, 2012 23 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ron Toma in regard to Defendant Live Nation Merchandise, Inc. (Thompson, Lawrence)
October 3, 2012 22 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The status hearing set for 10/15/2012 is moved to 9:30 a.m. on that date. (mk)
September 20, 2012 21 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly:Status hearing pursuant to Rule 16(b) held. The parties have reached settlement, subject to documentation. Status hearing continued to 10/15/2012 at 09:00 AM. (or, )
September 13, 2012 20 STIPULATION Regarding Continuance and Notice of Settlement (Thompson, Lawrence)
August 16, 2012 19 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly:Status hearing pursuant to Rule 16(b) held. Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures are to be made by 9/17/2012. Responses to the complaint are to be filed by 9/17/2012. Status hearing continued to 9/20/2012 at 09:00 AM. (or, )
August 14, 2012 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Live Nation Merchandise, Inc. by Erik S Maurer (Maurer, Erik)
August 14, 2012 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Live Nation Merchandise, Inc. by Jonathan Pieter van Es (van Es, Jonathan)
August 6, 2012 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ron Toma as to Live Nation Merchandise, Inc. on 8/1/2012, answer due 8/22/2012. (Thompson, Lawrence)
July 10, 2012 15 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Status hearing pursuant to Rule 16(b) held with all parties other than Live Nation. Status hearing continued to 8/16/2012 at 9:00 AM. Plaintiff's attorney is directed to notify defendant Live Nation. The motion of Alexander Frid to appear pro hac vice is granted ( 10 , 11 ). Counsel is directed to contact the Clerk's Office to establish an e-filing account in this district. Mailed notice (ao,)
June 29, 2012 14 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: On the Court's motion, the status hearing set for 7/3/12 is reset to 7/10/12 at 8:45 a.m., because Judge Kennelly will not be holding court on 7/3/12. (mk)
June 27, 2012 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants 11-7 Recording Corp., Kovac Media Group, Inc., Motley Crue, Inc. by Nury Agudo Siekkinen (Siekkinen, Nury)
June 27, 2012 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants 11-7 Recording Corp., Kovac Media Group, Inc., Motley Crue, Inc. by Daniel Martin Feeney (Feeney, Daniel)
June 27, 2012 11 MOTION by Defendants 11-7 Recording Corp., Kovac Media Group, Inc., Motley Crue, Inc. CORRECTED Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Frid, Alexander)
June 26, 2012 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-7292474. (Frid, Alexander)
June 19, 2012 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants 11-7 Recording Corp., Kovac Media Group, Inc., Live Nation Merchandise, Inc., Motley Crue, Inc. (jn, )
June 18, 2012 9 First AMENDED complaint by Ron Toma against Live Nation Merchandise, Inc., Motley Crue, Inc., Kovac Media Group, Inc. and terminating 10th Street Entertainment Associates, LLC and against 11-7 Recording Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B, # 2 Exhibit C and D)(Thompson, Lawrence)
June 6, 2012 8 NOTICE of Correction regarding 6 . (ao,)
June 5, 2012 7 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The entry under docket no. 6 was mistakenly entered in this case. The case remains set for a status hearing set for 7/3/12 at 9:00 a.m. under the terms previously ordered. (mk)
June 5, 2012 6 DOCUMENT entered in error. (mk) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office.)
June 5, 2012 5 MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Initial status hearing is set to 9:00 a.m. on 7/3/12 before Judge Kennelly, in Chambers, Room 2188. Parties are to review and comply with Judge Kennelly's standing initial order, which may be found on his web page, located at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/home/Judges.aspx. Counsel for plaintiff(s) are ordered to cause a copy of this order to be delivered forthwith to each defendant in the same manner that summons has been or is being served on each defendant. (mk)
April 17, 2012 4 MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (ao,)
April 16, 2012 1 COMPLAINT against Motley Crue, Inc, et al. filed by Ron Toma; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-7054119. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B, # 2 Exhibit C and D)(Thompson, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Toma v. Motley Crue, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Toma
Represented By: Lawrence E Thompson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motley Crue, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 11-7 Recording Corp.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 10th Street Entertainment Associates, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Live Nation Merchandise, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]