Tucker et al v. Charles Schwab Bank et al

Plaintiff: Marion J Tucker and Stephanie Tucker
Defendant: Charles Schwab Bank and Morgan Stanley Capital I, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv03399
Filed: May 3, 2012
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Harry D. Leinenweber
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 29, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 3/29/2013:Notices mailed by Judicial staff. (slb, )
July 31, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Defendant Morgan Stanley Capital I, Inc. for judgment (Stelter, Todd)
May 19, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 5/19/2014: For the reasons set forth in the Statement below, the Court denies the motion to dismiss. A status hearing is set for May 29, 2014, at 9:00 a.m. (For further details see order)Mailed notice(air, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker et al v. Charles Schwab Bank et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marion J Tucker
Represented By: Robert Lee Stone
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Tucker
Represented By: Robert Lee Stone
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Schwab Bank
Represented By: Keith H. Werwas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley Capital I, Inc.
Represented By: Todd Philip Stelter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]