White v. Polcyn et al

Defendant: Hilda L. Solis, James Polcyn and Antonia A Rios
Plaintiff: Frank W White
Case Number: 1:2012cv05176
Filed: June 28, 2012
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: James F. Holderman
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 7, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 2/7/13. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
February 20, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 2/20/13. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
March 4, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Plaintiff Frank W. White's application to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal 52 is denied, as his is motion for appointment of counsel 53 . In addition, Mr. White's motion for a mental examination 50 and his supplemental motion 51 are terminated as moot because the court does not have jurisdiction over those motions following the filing of Mr. White's notice of appeal. 43 Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 3/4/2013:Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Polcyn et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilda L. Solis
Represented By: AUSA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Polcyn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonia A Rios
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank W White
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]