United States of America v. Rominski et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Joseph R Rominski, Lorrine K Wallis, Great Lakes Credit Union and Lake County Illinois
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv07643
Filed: September 25, 2012
 
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Matthew F. Kennelly
 
Nature of Suit: Tax Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2014 75 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/25/2014: For the reasons stated in the accompanying decision, the Court denies the government's motion for partial summary judgment. A telephone status hearing is se t for July 1, 2014 at 8:45 a.m. for the purpose of setting a trial date. Counsel for the government is directed to make arrangements for the conference call and is to communicate those arrangements to chambers at least 24 hours prior to the conference. (mk)
September 22, 2014 95 Opinion or Order of the Court CORRECTED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/22/2014: The Court issues this corrected memorandum opinion and order to correct two scrivener's errors in the memorandum opinion and order dated June 25, 2014 denying the government's motion for partial summary judgment. The changes are found on page 4, fifth line from the bottom, and on page 6, third line from the top. (mk)
October 17, 2014 97 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order written by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/17/2014. For the reasons stated, the Court finds that the government has proven by a preponderance of the evidence that at all times since February 24, 2004, the date o f the Rominski-Wallis divorce decree, the Red Pine property has been and is the property of Joseph Rominski and that Lorrine Wallis holds title as his nominee. For this reason, the Court concludes that the government's lien as determined by th e April 5, 2013 judgment in this case attaches to the Red Pine property. The Court directs the government to prepare a proposed order embodying the Court's conclusion in this regard and directs Mr. Rominski to review it for form. The proposed order is to be submitted by no later than October 24, 2014. The case is set for a telephone status hearing on November 3, 2014 at 8:45 a.m. Counsel for the government is directed to make arrangements for the telephone status hearing and is to communicate the arrangements to the undersigned judge's chambers by no later than October 30, 2014. The Court will inquire at the status hearing what, if anything, remains to be determined in this case. Mailed notice.(pjg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. Rominski et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Larry Steven Schifano
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph R Rominski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorrine K Wallis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Lakes Credit Union
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake County Illinois
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]