Fox et al v. Prime Group Realty Trust et al

Plaintiff: Patricia Fox
Defendant: Prime Group Realty Trust, John M Sabin, Five Mile Capital Partners LLC, Riverview Realty LLC, Riverview Realty Merger Sub LLC, Five Mile Capital II Chicago REIT Preferred Investor SPE LLC, Five Mile Capital II Chicago REIT Equity Investor SPE LLC, Jeffrey A Patterson, James Jr. G Glasgow, Scott R Leitman, David L Reynolds, Shawn R Tominus and George R Whittmore
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv09350
Filed: November 21, 2012
 
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Matthew F. Kennelly
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity - Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 22, 2014 173 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/22/2014: For the reasons stated in this Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court grants plaintiff Fox's motion for class certification [docket no. 105]. The Court cer tifies the following class under Rule 23(b)(3): all holders of Prime Group Realty Trust's Series B Cumulative Redeemable Preferred Stock during the period November 1, 2011 through December 26, 2012, inclusive, who were damaged by Defendants 9; actions (the "Class"), with the following persons excluded: the defendants named in Plaintiff's Amended Class Action Complaint ("Original Defendants," listed below); any subsidiaries of the Original Defendants; the member s of the individual defendants' immediate families; the legal representatives, heirs, successors and assigns of any excluded person or entity; and the plaintiffs in the Rameson litigation who were parties to the settlement of that litigation and the resulting release of future claims. The Original Defendants are Riverview Realty Partners (f/k/a Prime Group Realty Trust), Riverview Realty, LLC, Riverview Realty Merger Sub, LLC, Five Mile Capital II Chicago Reit Preferred Investor SPE LLC, F ive Mile Capital II Chicago Reit Equity Investor SPE LLC, Jeffrey A. Patterson, James G. Glasgow, Jr., Scott R. Leitman, David L. Reynolds, Shawn R. Tominus, John M. Sabin, George R. Whittemore, James F. Hoffman, Paul G. Del Vecchio, Steven R. Baron and Victoria A. Cory. The Court also appoints the following attorneys as class counsel: Clinton A. Krislov, John Orellana, Robin Switzenbaum, Lawrence Deutsch, Jeffrey L. Osterwise, and Gerald W. Berger. (mk)
December 21, 2012 61 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/21/2012: For the reasons stated in this Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court denies plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction and denies as moot defendants' motion to strike. The case is set for a status hearing on 1/17/2013 at 9:30 a.m. to set a schedule for further proceedings.(mk)
May 10, 2013 86 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 5/10/2013: Motion to dismiss 70 is granted in part and denied in part as stated in this Memorandum Opinion and Order. Status hearing set for 5/23/2013 at 9:30 AM. (mk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Fox et al v. Prime Group Realty Trust et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Fox
Represented By: Gerald W. Berger
Represented By: Lawrence Deutsch
Represented By: Clinton A. Krislov
Represented By: Jeffrey L Osterwise
Represented By: Robin B Switzenbaum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Group Realty Trust
Represented By: Robert N. Hermes
Represented By: James A. Morsch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M Sabin
Represented By: Lawrence R. Desideri
Represented By: Matthias A. Lydon
Represented By: William Charles O'Neil
Represented By: Kathryn A. Wendel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Five Mile Capital Partners LLC
Represented By: Gus Peter Coldebella
Represented By: Michael K. Forde
Represented By: Matthew G Lindenbaum
Represented By: Kevin R. Malloy
Represented By: Daniel P Roeser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverview Realty LLC
Represented By: Gus Peter Coldebella
Represented By: Michael K. Forde
Represented By: Matthew G Lindenbaum
Represented By: Kevin R. Malloy
Represented By: Daniel P Roeser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverview Realty Merger Sub LLC
Represented By: Gus Peter Coldebella
Represented By: Michael K. Forde
Represented By: Matthew G Lindenbaum
Represented By: Kevin R. Malloy
Represented By: Daniel P Roeser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Five Mile Capital II Chicago REIT Preferred Investor SPE LLC
Represented By: Gus Peter Coldebella
Represented By: Michael K. Forde
Represented By: Matthew G Lindenbaum
Represented By: Kevin R. Malloy
Represented By: Daniel P Roeser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Five Mile Capital II Chicago REIT Equity Investor SPE LLC
Represented By: Gus Peter Coldebella
Represented By: Michael K. Forde
Represented By: Matthew G Lindenbaum
Represented By: Kevin R. Malloy
Represented By: Daniel P Roeser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey A Patterson
Represented By: Lawrence R. Desideri
Represented By: Matthias A. Lydon
Represented By: William Charles O'Neil
Represented By: Kathryn A. Wendel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Jr. G Glasgow
Represented By: Lawrence R. Desideri
Represented By: Matthias A. Lydon
Represented By: William Charles O'Neil
Represented By: Kathryn A. Wendel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott R Leitman
Represented By: Lawrence R. Desideri
Represented By: Matthias A. Lydon
Represented By: William Charles O'Neil
Represented By: Kathryn A. Wendel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L Reynolds
Represented By: Lawrence R. Desideri
Represented By: Matthias A. Lydon
Represented By: William Charles O'Neil
Represented By: Kathryn A. Wendel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn R Tominus
Represented By: Lawrence R. Desideri
Represented By: Matthias A. Lydon
Represented By: William Charles O'Neil
Represented By: Kathryn A. Wendel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George R Whittmore
Represented By: Lawrence R. Desideri
Represented By: Matthias A. Lydon
Represented By: William Charles O'Neil
Represented By: Kathryn A. Wendel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]