Massuda v. Panda Express, Inc. et al

Defendant: Panda Restaurant Group, Inc., Andrew Cherng, Panda Express, Inc., Citadel Panda Express, Inc. and Peggy Cherng
Plaintiff: Fortunee Massuda
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv09683
Filed: December 5, 2012
 
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Ronald A. Guzman
 
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 15, 2014 100 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Young B. Kim on 1/15/2014. (ma,)
July 16, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: Defendants' motion to dismiss [22-1] is granted in part and denied in part. All of Massuda's claims are dismissed except her individual fraud claim regarding Defendants' statement that her interest in PE Chicago was "worthless." Defendants' motion to take judicial notice of the state court filing [32-1] is granted. Plaintiff has 14 days from the date of entry of this order to file an amended fraud claim. Signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 7/16/2013. Mailed notice (cjg, )
August 2, 2013 72 Opinion or Order of the Court MOTION by Defendants Andrew Cherng, Peggy Cherng, Citadel Panda Express, Inc., Panda Express, Inc., Panda Restaurant Group, Inc. for judgment as proposed (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Final Judgment)(Miari, Tanya)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Massuda v. Panda Express, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panda Restaurant Group, Inc.
Represented By: Michael R. Dockterman
Represented By: William R Lee
Represented By: Tanya Hiba Miari
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Cherng
Represented By: Michael R. Dockterman
Represented By: William R Lee
Represented By: Tanya Hiba Miari
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panda Express, Inc.
Represented By: Michael R. Dockterman
Represented By: William R Lee
Represented By: Tanya Hiba Miari
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citadel Panda Express, Inc.
Represented By: Michael R. Dockterman
Represented By: William R Lee
Represented By: Tanya Hiba Miari
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peggy Cherng
Represented By: Michael R. Dockterman
Represented By: William R Lee
Represented By: Tanya Hiba Miari
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fortunee Massuda
Represented By: Timothy M Schaum
Represented By: Robert S. Grabemann
Represented By: Vincent V. Frigo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]