Lyon v. Illinois High School Association

Plaintiff: Matthew Lyon
Defendant: Illinois High School Association
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00173
Filed: January 9, 2013
 
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Harry D. Leinenweber
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 10, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 1/10/2013. (et, )
January 11, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John W. Darrah on 1/11/2013. (et, )
January 25, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 1/25/2013:Mailed notice(wp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lyon v. Illinois High School Association
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Lyon
Represented By: Jacie C Zolna
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois High School Association
Represented By: David Joel Bressler
Represented By: Melanie Jeanne Chico
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]