Tratar v. First Federal Savings Bank of Ottawa et al

Defendant: First Federal Savings Bank of Ottawa, Konai Rodeghier, Tony Kensinger and Rachel Krug
Plaintiff: Lauren J Tratar
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01562
Filed: February 28, 2013
 
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Du Page
Presiding Judge: Milton I. Shadur
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 13, 2013 10 Featured Case ENTER MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 3/13/2013. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
April 24, 2013 14 Featured Case MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 4/24/2013. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
June 13, 2013 20 Featured Case MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 6/13/2013. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Tratar v. First Federal Savings Bank of Ottawa et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Federal Savings Bank of Ottawa
Represented By: Bradley H. Foreman
Represented By: Ronald O. Roeser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Konai Rodeghier
Represented By: Bradley H. Foreman
Represented By: Ronald O. Roeser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Kensinger
Represented By: Bradley H. Foreman
Represented By: Ronald O. Roeser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Krug
Represented By: Bradley H. Foreman
Represented By: Ronald O. Roeser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren J Tratar
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]