Lobacz v. City Of Chicago

Plaintiff: Nicholas Lobacz
Defendant: City Of Chicago
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01777
Filed: March 7, 2013
 
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Milton I. Shadur
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 16, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTER MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 4/16/2013. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
April 22, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 4/22/2013. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
March 12, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 3/12/2013. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
March 15, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTER MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 3/15/2013. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lobacz v. City Of Chicago
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Lobacz
Represented By: Adam B Goodman
Represented By: Wesley E. Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Chicago
Represented By: J Ernest Mincy, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]