Sequoia Financial Solutions, Inc. v. Godfrey, Jr. et al

Plaintiff: Sequoia Financial Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: David Godfrey, Jr. and Illinois Department of Revenue, The
Case Number: 1:2013cv02983
Filed: April 19, 2013
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Milton I. Shadur
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Mortgage Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 12, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 9/12/2013. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
October 1, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 10/1/2013. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)
April 29, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 4/29/2013. Mailed notice by judge's staff. (srb,)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sequoia Financial Solutions, Inc. v. Godfrey, Jr. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sequoia Financial Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: David C. Thollander
Represented By: Paul G Wersant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Godfrey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Department of Revenue, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.