Ivankina v. Facebook, Inc. et al Featured Case

Defendant: Facebook Ireland Limited and Facebook, Inc.
Plaintiff: Darya Ivankina
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv03450
Filed: May 8, 2013
 
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Harry D. Leinenweber
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
September 17, 2013 21 MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Cause voluntarily dismissed with prejudice, with each party bearing its own attorneys' fees and costs.Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (wp, )
July 30, 2013 20 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Darya Ivankina (Sweetnam, William)
July 12, 2013 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-8533185. (Antia, Mazda)
July 11, 2013 19 MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:The Second Motion for extension of time to 7/23/2013 in which to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint 14 is granted.Mailed notice (wp, )
July 9, 2013 17 NOTICE of Motion by William M Sweetnam for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 16 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 7/16/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Sweetnam, William)
July 9, 2013 16 MOTION by counsel for Plaintiff Darya Ivankina to withdraw as attorney (Sweetnam, William)
July 8, 2013 15 NOTICE of Motion by Michael David Frisch for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, motion for relief 14 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 7/11/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Frisch, Michael)
July 8, 2013 14 MOTION by Defendants Facebook Ireland Limited, Facebook, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint 1 (Second Unopposed Motion) (Frisch, Michael)
June 19, 2013 13 MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Defendants Unopposed Motion for extension of time to 7/9/2013 in which to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint 11 is granted.Mailed notice (wp, )
June 14, 2013 12 NOTICE of Motion by Michael David Frisch for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, motion for relief 11 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 6/19/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Frisch, Michael)
June 14, 2013 11 MOTION by Defendants Facebook Ireland Limited, Facebook, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint 1 (Unopposed) (Frisch, Michael)
June 14, 2013 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Facebook Ireland Limited, Facebook, Inc. by Michael David Frisch (Frisch, Michael)
June 14, 2013 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Facebook Ireland Limited, Facebook, Inc. by Vincent J. Connelly (Connelly, Vincent)
June 4, 2013 8 MINUTE entry before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: This action having been reassigned to the calendar of Judge Leinenweber, the motion hearing scheduled for 6/20/13, before Judge Aspen, is stricken. The motion for class certification (2) is to be re-notived before J. Leinenweber.Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, )
June 3, 2013 7 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/3/2013.(lp, )
May 30, 2013 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Darya Ivankina by William M Sweetnam (Sweetnam, William)
May 13, 2013 5 MINUTE entry before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen:The hearing date of 5/16/13, regarding Plaintiffs' motion to certify class 2 , is stricken and reset to 6/20/2013 at 10:30 AM.Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, )
May 9, 2013 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Darya Ivankina by Matthew M Rossetti (Rossetti, Matthew)
May 8, 2013 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Facebook Ireland Limited, Facebook, Inc. (tlm)
May 8, 2013 3 NOTICE of Motion by William M Sweetnam for presentment of motion to certify class 2 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 5/16/2013 at 10:30 AM. (Sweetnam, William)
May 8, 2013 2 MOTION by Plaintiff Darya Ivankina to certify class (Sweetnam, William)
May 8, 2013 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Michael T. Mason. (jn, )
May 8, 2013 1 COMPLAINT filed by Darya Ivankina; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-8324948. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sweetnam, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ivankina v. Facebook, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Ireland Limited
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darya Ivankina
Represented By: Matthew M Rossetti
Represented By: William M Sweetnam
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]